CA AB469 | 2011-2012 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on October 9 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-10-09 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 655, Statutes of 2011.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

An act to amend Sections 98, 226, 240, 243, 1174, and 1197.1 of, and to add Sections 200.5, 1194.3, 1197.2, 1206, and 2810.5 to, the Labor Code, relating to employment.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Employees: wages.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2011-09-06 - Assembly - AB 469 SWANSON Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 51 N: 27 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2011-08-31 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB469 Swanson By Lieu (Y: 21 N: 14 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-07-05 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 3 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-06-22 - Senate - Do pass as amended, and re-refer to the Committee on Judiciary (Y: 5 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-06-01 - Assembly - AB 469 SWANSON Assembly Third Reading (Y: 50 N: 25 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2011-05-27 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 12 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-04-26 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 6 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2011-04-13 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Judiciary (Y: 5 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2011-10-09 Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 655, Statutes of 2011.
2011-10-09 Approved by the Governor.
2011-09-19 Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 1:30 p.m.
2011-09-06 Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 51. Noes 27. Page 2907.).
2011-09-01 In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after September 3 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
2011-08-31 Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 21. Noes 14. Page 2203.).
2011-08-30 Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
2011-08-29 Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
2011-08-16 Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
2011-08-15 From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on APPR. From committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8.
2011-07-12 From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2011-07-06 From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 3. Noes 2.) (July 5). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2011-06-27 Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on JUD.
2011-06-23 From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on JUD. (Ayes 5. Noes 1.) (June 22).
2011-06-14 From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on L. & I.R.
2011-06-08 Referred to Coms. on L. & I.R. and JUD.
2011-06-01 In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
2011-06-01 Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 50. Noes 25. Page 1725.)
2011-05-31 Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
2011-05-27 From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 12. Noes 5.) (May 27). Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
2011-05-18 In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
2011-05-04 Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2011-05-03 Read second time and amended.
2011-05-02 From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 3.) (April 26).
2011-04-25 Re-referred to Com. on JUD.
2011-04-14 From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on JUD. (Ayes 5. Noes 1.) (April 13). Re-referred to Com. on JUD. From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on JUD. Read second time and amended.
2011-04-11 Re-referred to Com. on L. & E.
2011-04-07 From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on L. & E. Read second time and amended.
2011-04-04 Re-referred to Com. on L. & E.
2011-03-31 Referred to Coms. on L. & E. and JUD. From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on L. & E. Read second time and amended.
2011-02-16 From printer. May be heard in committee March 18.
2011-02-15 Read first time. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Labor Code1174Amended CodeCitation Text
Labor Code1194.3New CodeSee Bill Text
Labor Code1197.1Amended CodeCitation Text
Labor Code1197.2New CodeSee Bill Text
Labor Code1206New CodeSee Bill Text
Labor Code200.5New CodeSee Bill Text
Labor Code226Amended CodeCitation Text
Labor Code240Amended CodeCitation Text
Labor Code243Amended CodeCitation Text
Labor Code2810.5New CodeSee Bill Text
Labor Code2811New CodeSee Bill Text
Labor Code98Amended CodeCitation Text

California State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/cgi-bin/postquery?bill_number=ab_469&sess=1112&house=A
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/11-12/bill/asm/ab_0451-0500/ab_469_bill_20110215_introduced.html
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/11-12/bill/asm/ab_0451-0500/ab_469_bill_20110331_amended_asm_v98.html
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/11-12/bill/asm/ab_0451-0500/ab_469_bill_20110407_amended_asm_v97.html
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/11-12/bill/asm/ab_0451-0500/ab_469_bill_20110414_amended_asm_v96.html
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/11-12/bill/asm/ab_0451-0500/ab_469_bill_20110503_amended_asm_v95.html
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/11-12/bill/asm/ab_0451-0500/ab_469_bill_20110527_amended_asm_v94.html
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/11-12/bill/asm/ab_0451-0500/ab_469_bill_20110614_amended_sen_v93.html
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/11-12/bill/asm/ab_0451-0500/ab_469_bill_20110627_amended_sen_v92.html
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/11-12/bill/asm/ab_0451-0500/ab_469_bill_20110712_amended_sen_v91.html
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/11-12/bill/asm/ab_0451-0500/ab_469_bill_20110815_amended_sen_v90.html
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/11-12/bill/asm/ab_0451-0500/ab_469_bill_20110829_amended_sen_v89.html
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/11-12/bill/asm/ab_0451-0500/ab_469_bill_20110912_enrolled.html
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/11-12/bill/asm/ab_0451-0500/ab_469_bill_20111009_chaptered.html
Roll Callhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/11-12/bill/asm/ab_0451-0500/ab_469_vote_20110413_000003_asm_comm.html
Roll Callhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/11-12/bill/asm/ab_0451-0500/ab_469_vote_20110426_000002_asm_comm.html
Roll Callhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/11-12/bill/asm/ab_0451-0500/ab_469_vote_20110527_000002_asm_comm.html
Roll Callhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/11-12/bill/asm/ab_0451-0500/ab_469_vote_20110601_0253PM_asm_floor.html
Roll Callhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/11-12/bill/asm/ab_0451-0500/ab_469_vote_20110622_000002_sen_comm.html
Roll Callhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/11-12/bill/asm/ab_0451-0500/ab_469_vote_20110705_000001_sen_comm.html
Roll Callhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/11-12/bill/asm/ab_0451-0500/ab_469_vote_20110831_0113PM_sen_floor.html
Roll Callhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/11-12/bill/asm/ab_0451-0500/ab_469_vote_20110906_1259PM_asm_floor.html

Bill Comments 750

feedback