CA AB469 | 2009-2010 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Vetoed on October 11 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-01-14 - Consideration of Governor's veto stricken from file.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

An act to amend Sections 6452.1, 6453, 6487.3, and 18510 of the Revenue and Taxation Code, relating to taxation.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Sales and use taxes: qualified use tax payment.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2009-09-02 - Assembly - AB 469 ENG Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 47 N: 30 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-08-31 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB469 Eng By Wolk (Y: 22 N: 14 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-08-17 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 8 N: 3 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-07-08 - Senate - Do pass as amended, and re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-05-26 - Assembly - AB 469 ENG Assembly Third Reading (Y: 49 N: 30 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-05-13 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 11 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-04-27 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 6 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2010-01-14 Consideration of Governor's veto stricken from file.
2009-10-26 Consideration of Governor's veto pending.
2009-10-11 Vetoed by Governor.
2009-09-08 Enrolled and to the Governor at 2:45 p.m.
2009-09-02 Assembly Rule 77 suspended. (Ayes 48. Noes 27. Page 2889.) Senate amendments concurred in. To enrollment. (Ayes 47. Noes 30. Page 2943.)
2009-09-01 In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after September 3 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
2009-08-31 Read third time, passed, and to Assembly. (Ayes 22. Noes 14. Page 2021.)
2009-08-19 Read second time. To third reading.
2009-08-18 From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 8. Noes 3.) (August 17).
2009-08-17 From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on APPR. (Corrected August 17.)
2009-07-15 Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2009-07-14 From committee: Amend, do pass as amended, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 2.) (July 8).
2009-06-24 In committee: Hearing postponed by committee.
2009-06-22 In committee: Hearing postponed by committee.
2009-06-18 From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on REV. & TAX.
2009-06-11 Referred to Com. on REV. & TAX.
2009-05-27 In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
2009-05-26 Read third time, passed, and to Senate. (Ayes 49. Noes 30. Page 1685.)
2009-05-18 Read second time. To third reading.
2009-05-14 From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 11. Noes 5.) (May 13).
2009-04-28 From committee: Do pass, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. Re-referred. (Ayes 6. Noes 2.) (April 27).
2009-04-27 In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to REV. & TAX. suspense file.
2009-04-13 Re-referred to Com. on REV. & TAX.
2009-04-02 From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on REV. & TAX. Read second time and amended.
2009-03-12 Referred to Com. on REV. & TAX.
2009-02-25 From printer. May be heard in committee March 27.
2009-02-24 Read first time. To print.

Code Citations


California State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/cgi-bin/postquery?bill_number=ab_469&sess=0910&house=A
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/09-10/bill/asm/ab_0451-0500/ab_469_bill_20090224_introduced.html
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/09-10/bill/asm/ab_0451-0500/ab_469_bill_20090402_amended_asm_v98.html
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/09-10/bill/asm/ab_0451-0500/ab_469_bill_20090618_amended_sen_v97.html
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/09-10/bill/asm/ab_0451-0500/ab_469_bill_20090715_amended_sen_v96.html
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/09-10/bill/asm/ab_0451-0500/ab_469_bill_20090817_amended_sen_v95.html
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/09-10/bill/asm/ab_0451-0500/ab_469_bill_20090904_enrolled.html
Roll Callhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/09-10/bill/asm/ab_0451-0500/ab_469_vote_20090427_000003_asm_comm.html
Roll Callhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/09-10/bill/asm/ab_0451-0500/ab_469_vote_20090513_000001_asm_comm.html
Roll Callhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/09-10/bill/asm/ab_0451-0500/ab_469_vote_20090526_0205PM_asm_floor.html
Roll Callhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/09-10/bill/asm/ab_0451-0500/ab_469_vote_20090708_000003_sen_comm.html
Roll Callhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/09-10/bill/asm/ab_0451-0500/ab_469_vote_20090817_000002_sen_comm.html
Roll Callhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/09-10/bill/asm/ab_0451-0500/ab_469_vote_20090831_0502PM_sen_floor.html
Roll Callhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/09-10/bill/asm/ab_0451-0500/ab_469_vote_20090902_0431PM_asm_floor.html

Bill Comments 750

feedback