CA AB464 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 28 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-28 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 25, Statutes of 2021.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 28 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-28 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 25, Statutes of 2021.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 53398.52 of the Government Code, relating to local government.
Title
Enhanced Infrastructure Financing Districts: allowable facilities and projects.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-06-17 - Senate - Consent Calendar AB464 (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-10 - Senate - Do pass and be ordered to the Consent Calendar (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-22 - Assembly - AB 464 Mullin Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 77 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-14 - Assembly - Do pass. To Consent Calendar (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-10 - Senate - Do pass and be ordered to the Consent Calendar (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-22 - Assembly - AB 464 Mullin Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 77 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-14 - Assembly - Do pass. To Consent Calendar (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-06-28 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 25, Statutes of 2021. | |
2021-06-28 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2021-06-22 | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4:15 p.m. | |
2021-06-17 | Assembly | In Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling. |
2021-06-17 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 37. Noes 0. Page 1544.). |
2021-06-14 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar. |
2021-06-10 | Senate | From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 5. Noes 0.) (June 10). |
2021-05-12 | Senate | Referred to Com. on GOV. & F. |
2021-04-26 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2021-04-22 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 77. Noes 0. Page 1156.) |
2021-04-19 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar. |
2021-04-15 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (April 14). |
2021-03-26 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on L. GOV. |
2021-03-25 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on L. GOV. Read second time and amended. |
2021-02-18 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on L. GOV. |
2021-02-09 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 11. |
2021-02-08 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Government Code | 53398.52 | Amended Code | Citation Text |