CA AB459 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Failed on February 3 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-02-03 - From committee: Filed with the Chief Clerk pursuant to Joint Rule 56.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

An act to add and repeal Section 11820.50 of the Government Code, relating to state government.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

State government: Artificial Intelligence in State Government Services Commission: report.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-04-24 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-02 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Accountability and Administrative Review] (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-02-03AssemblyFrom committee: Filed with the Chief Clerk pursuant to Joint Rule 56.
2020-01-31AssemblyDied pursuant to Art. IV, Sec. 10(c) of the Constitution.
2019-05-16AssemblyIn committee: Held under submission.
2019-05-01AssemblyIn committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
2019-04-24AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 4. Noes 0.) (April 24). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2019-04-09AssemblyRe-referred to Com. on A. & A.R.
2019-04-08AssemblyRead second time and amended.
2019-04-04AssemblyFrom committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on A. & A.R. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (April 2).
2019-03-26AssemblyRe-referred to Com. on P. & C.P.
2019-03-25AssemblyFrom committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on P. & C.P. Read second time and amended.
2019-03-21AssemblyReferred to Coms. on P. & C.P. and A. & A.R.
2019-02-12AssemblyFrom printer. May be heard in committee March 14.
2019-02-11AssemblyRead first time. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Government Code11820.50Repealed CodeCitation Text

California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback