CA AB457 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on October 1 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-10-01 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 439, Statutes of 2021.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

An act to amend Section 650 of the Business and Professions Code, to amend Section 1374.14 of, and to add Section 1374.141 to, the Health and Safety Code, and to amend Section 10123.855 of, and to add Section 10123.856 to, the Insurance Code, relating to telehealth.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Protection of Patient Choice in Telehealth Provider Act.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-09-10 - Assembly - AB 457 Santiago Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 75 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2021-09-10 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB457 Santiago et al. By Pan (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-08-26 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-07-15 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-23 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 9 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-27 - Assembly - AB 457 Santiago Assembly Third Reading (Y: 63 N: 1 NV: 14 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-20 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-20 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-10-01 Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 439, Statutes of 2021.
2021-10-01 Approved by the Governor.
2021-09-22 Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 2 p.m.
2021-09-10AssemblySenate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 75. Noes 0.).
2021-09-10AssemblyIn Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending.
2021-09-10SenateRead third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 37. Noes 0.).
2021-09-07SenateRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2021-09-03SenateRead third time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
2021-08-26SenateRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2021-08-26SenateFrom committee: Do pass. (Ayes 5. Noes 2.) (August 26).
2021-07-15SenateIn committee: Referred to suspense file.
2021-06-28SenateRead second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2021-06-24SenateFrom committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 9. Noes 1.) (June 23).
2021-06-14SenateFrom committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on HEALTH.
2021-06-09SenateReferred to Com. on HEALTH.
2021-05-28SenateIn Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
2021-05-27AssemblyRead third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 63. Noes 1.)
2021-05-24AssemblyRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2021-05-20AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass. (Ayes 12. Noes 0.) (May 20).
2021-05-12AssemblyIn committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
2021-04-28AssemblyRe-referred to Com. on APPR.
2021-04-27AssemblyRead second time and amended.
2021-04-26AssemblyFrom committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 13. Noes 0.) (April 20).
2021-04-12AssemblyRe-referred to Com. on HEALTH.
2021-04-08AssemblyFrom committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on HEALTH. Read second time and amended.
2021-02-18AssemblyReferred to Com. on HEALTH.
2021-02-09AssemblyFrom printer. May be heard in committee March 11.
2021-02-08AssemblyRead first time. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Business and Professions Code650Amended CodeCitation Text
Health and Safety Code1374.14Amended CodeCitation Text
Health and Safety Code1374.141New CodeSee Bill Text
Insurance Code10123.855Amended CodeCitation Text
Insurance Code10123.856New CodeSee Bill Text

California State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://leginfo.legislature.ca.gov/faces/billStatusClient.xhtml?bill_id=202120220AB457
Texthttps://leginfo.legislature.ca.gov/faces/billTextClient.xhtml?bill_id=202120220AB457#99INT
Texthttps://leginfo.legislature.ca.gov/faces/billTextClient.xhtml?bill_id=202120220AB457#98AMD
Texthttps://leginfo.legislature.ca.gov/faces/billTextClient.xhtml?bill_id=202120220AB457#97AMD
Texthttps://leginfo.legislature.ca.gov/faces/billTextClient.xhtml?bill_id=202120220AB457#96AMD
Texthttps://leginfo.legislature.ca.gov/faces/billTextClient.xhtml?bill_id=202120220AB457#95AMD
Texthttps://leginfo.legislature.ca.gov/faces/billTextClient.xhtml?bill_id=202120220AB457#94AMD
Texthttps://leginfo.legislature.ca.gov/faces/billTextClient.xhtml?bill_id=202120220AB457#93ENR
Texthttps://leginfo.legislature.ca.gov/faces/billTextClient.xhtml?bill_id=202120220AB457#92CHP
Roll Callhttp://leginfo.legislature.ca.gov/faces/billVotesClient.xhtml?bill_id=202120220AB457

Bill Comments

feedback