CA AB457 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 25 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-09-13 - Ordered to inactive file at the request of Senator Hertzberg.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

An act to add Section 6717.5 to the Labor Code, relating to lead exposure levels.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Occupational safety and health: lead: permissible exposure levels.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-06-12 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-25 - Assembly - AB 457 Quirk Assembly Third Reading (Y: 59 N: 9 NV: 12 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-10 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-20 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-09-13SenateOrdered to inactive file at the request of Senator Hertzberg.
2019-09-11SenateRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2019-09-10SenateOrdered to second reading.
2019-09-10SenateFrom inactive file.
2019-07-05SenateOrdered to inactive file at the request of Senator Hill.
2019-06-25SenateRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2019-06-24SenateFrom committee: Be ordered to second reading pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8.
2019-06-12SenateFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 4. Noes 1.) (June 12). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2019-05-13SenateFrom committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on L., P.E. & R.
2019-05-08SenateReferred to Com. on L., P.E. & R.
2019-04-25SenateIn Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
2019-04-25AssemblyRead third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 59. Noes 9. Page 1351.)
2019-04-11AssemblyRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2019-04-10AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass. (Ayes 12. Noes 0.) (April 10).
2019-03-20AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 0.) (March 20). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2019-02-21AssemblyReferred to Com. on L. & E.
2019-02-12AssemblyFrom printer. May be heard in committee March 14.
2019-02-11AssemblyRead first time. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Labor Code6717.5New CodeSee Bill Text

California State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback