CA AB457 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on February 1 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-02-01 - From committee: Filed with the Chief Clerk pursuant to Joint Rule 56.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

An act to amend Section 149.7 of the Streets and Highways Code, relating to transportation.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

High-occupancy toll lanes.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2016-02-01AssemblyFrom committee: Filed with the Chief Clerk pursuant to Joint Rule 56.
2016-01-31AssemblyDied pursuant to Article IV, Sec. 10(c) of the Constitution.
2015-04-20AssemblyIn committee: Hearing postponed by committee.
2015-04-06AssemblyRe-referred to Com. on TRANS.
2015-03-26AssemblyReferred to Com. on TRANS. From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on TRANS. Read second time and amended.
2015-02-24AssemblyFrom printer. May be heard in committee March 26.
2015-02-23AssemblyRead first time. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Streets and Highways Code149Amended CodeCitation Text
Streets and Highways Code149.7Amended CodeCitation Text

California State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback