CA AB457 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on August 16 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-08-16 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 109, Statutes of 2013.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

An act to amend Section 603 of the Corporations Code, relating to corporations.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Shareholders.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2013-07-08 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB457 Torres By Torres (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-06-05 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-11 - Assembly - AB 457 TORRES Assembly Third Reading (Y: 75 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2013-04-08 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2013-08-16 Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 109, Statutes of 2013.
2013-08-16 Approved by the Governor.
2013-08-12AssemblyEnrolled and presented to the Governor at 2:40 p.m.
2013-08-05AssemblyIn Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling.
2013-07-08SenateRead third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 33. Noes 0. Page 1685.).
2013-06-06SenateRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2013-06-05SenateFrom committee: Do pass. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (June 5).
2013-04-25SenateReferred to Com. on B. & F.I.
2013-04-11SenateIn Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
2013-04-11AssemblyRead third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 75. Noes 0. Page 883.)
2013-04-10AssemblyRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2013-04-09AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass. (Ayes 12. Noes 0.) (April 8).
2013-04-04AssemblyIn committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
2013-02-28AssemblyReferred to Com. on B. & F.
2013-02-20AssemblyFrom printer. May be heard in committee March 22.
2013-02-19AssemblyRead first time. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Corporations Code603Amended CodeCitation Text

California State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/cgi-bin/postquery?bill_number=ab_457&sess=1314&house=A
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/13-14/bill/asm/ab_0451-0500/ab_457_bill_20130219_introduced.html
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/13-14/bill/asm/ab_0451-0500/ab_457_bill_20130808_enrolled.html
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/13-14/bill/asm/ab_0451-0500/ab_457_bill_20130816_chaptered.html
Roll Callhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/13-14/bill/asm/ab_0451-0500/ab_457_vote_20130408_000002_asm_comm.html
Roll Callhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/13-14/bill/asm/ab_0451-0500/ab_457_vote_20130411_1011AM_asm_floor.html
Roll Callhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/13-14/bill/asm/ab_0451-0500/ab_457_vote_20130605_000001_sen_comm.html
Roll Callhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/13-14/bill/asm/ab_0451-0500/ab_457_vote_20130708_0158PM_sen_floor.html

Bill Comments 750

feedback