CA AB455 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 27 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-08-11 - In committee: Held under submission.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 27 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-08-11 - In committee: Held under submission.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add Section 30952.4 to the Streets and Highways Code, relating to transportation.
Title
San Francisco-Oakland Bay Bridge: bus speed and reliability performance targets.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-06-27 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-06-14 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 11 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2021-05-27 - Assembly - AB 455 Wicks Assembly Third Reading (Y: 55 N: 15 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-12 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 12 N: 2 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-26 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-06-14 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 11 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2021-05-27 - Assembly - AB 455 Wicks Assembly Third Reading (Y: 55 N: 15 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-12 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 12 N: 2 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-26 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-08-11 | Senate | In committee: Held under submission. |
2022-06-27 | Senate | In committee: Referred to suspense file. |
2022-06-15 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 11. Noes 1.) (June 14). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2022-06-06 | Senate | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on TRANS. |
2021-06-09 | Senate | Referred to Com. on TRANS. |
2021-05-28 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2021-05-27 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 55. Noes 15. Page 1586.) |
2021-05-20 | Assembly | Read third time and amended. Ordered to third reading. (Page 1465.) |
2021-05-13 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2021-05-12 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 12. Noes 2.) (May 12). |
2021-04-27 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (April 26). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2021-04-27 | Assembly | Coauthors revised. |
2021-04-26 | Assembly | Assembly Rule 47.1 invoked. (Wicks). |
2021-03-26 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on TRANS. |
2021-03-25 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on TRANS. Read second time and amended. |
2021-02-18 | Assembly | Referred to Coms. on TRANS. and L. GOV. |
2021-02-09 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 11. |
2021-02-08 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Streets and Highways Code | 30952.4 | New Code | See Bill Text |