CA AB454 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 27 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-09-27 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 349, Statutes of 2019.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 27 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-09-27 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 349, Statutes of 2019.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend, repeal, and add Section 3513 of the Fish and Game Code, relating to migratory birds.
Title
Migratory birds: California Migratory Bird Protection Act.
Sponsors
Asm. Ash Kalra [D] |
Roll Calls
2019-09-03 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB454 Kalra By Skinner (Y: 29 N: 9 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-07-09 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-23 - Assembly - AB 454 Kalra Assembly Third Reading (Y: 55 N: 21 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-16 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 13 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-26 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 8 N: 3 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-07-09 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-23 - Assembly - AB 454 Kalra Assembly Third Reading (Y: 55 N: 21 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-16 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 13 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-26 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 8 N: 3 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-09-27 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 349, Statutes of 2019. | |
2019-09-27 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2019-09-09 | Assembly | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3:30 p.m. |
2019-09-03 | Assembly | In Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling. |
2019-09-03 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 29. Noes 9. Page 2443.). |
2019-08-13 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2019-08-12 | Senate | From committee: Be ordered to second reading pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8. |
2019-07-10 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 1.) (July 9). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2019-06-06 | Senate | Referred to Com. on N.R. & W. |
2019-05-24 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2019-05-23 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 55. Noes 21. Page 1932.) |
2019-05-20 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2019-05-16 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading. |
2019-05-16 | Assembly | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 13. Noes 5.) (May 16). |
2019-04-10 | Assembly | In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file. |
2019-03-26 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 8. Noes 3.) (March 26). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2019-02-21 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on W., P., & W. |
2019-02-12 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 14. |
2019-02-11 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Fish and Game Code | 3513 | Amended Code | Citation Text |