CA AB45 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on October 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-10-08 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 570, Statutes of 2019.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on October 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-10-08 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 570, Statutes of 2019.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 5008.2 of, to add Sections 4011.3 and 5007.9 to, and to repeal and add Sections 4011.2 and 5007.5 of, the Penal Code, relating to inmates.
Title
Inmates: medical care: fees.
Sponsors
Asm. Reginald Jones-Sawyer [D] | Asm. Mark Stone [D] | Asm. David Chiu [D] | Asm. Ash Kalra [D] |
Sen. Scott Wiener [D] |
Roll Calls
2019-09-09 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB45 Mark Stone et al. By Bradford (Y: 29 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-08-30 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-08-12 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-25 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-23 - Assembly - AB 45 Mark Stone Assembly Third Reading (Y: 47 N: 24 NV: 9 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-16 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 11 N: 6 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-26 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-08-30 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-08-12 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-25 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-23 - Assembly - AB 45 Mark Stone Assembly Third Reading (Y: 47 N: 24 NV: 9 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-16 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 11 N: 6 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-26 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-10-08 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 570, Statutes of 2019. | |
2019-10-08 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2019-09-17 | Assembly | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3:30 p.m. |
2019-09-09 | Assembly | In Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling. |
2019-09-09 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 29. Noes 11. Page 2694.). |
2019-08-30 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2019-08-30 | Senate | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 5. Noes 2.) (August 30). |
2019-08-12 | Senate | In committee: Referred to APPR. suspense file. |
2019-06-25 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 1.) (June 25). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2019-06-06 | Senate | Referred to Com. on PUB. S. |
2019-05-24 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2019-05-23 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 47. Noes 24. Page 1891.) |
2019-05-20 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2019-05-16 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 11. Noes 6.) (May 16). |
2019-03-06 | Assembly | In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file. |
2019-02-26 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 1.) (February 26). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2019-02-21 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S. |
2019-02-20 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on PUB. S. Read second time and amended. |
2019-01-17 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on PUB. S. |
2018-12-04 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee January 3. |
2018-12-03 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Penal Code | 4011.3 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Penal Code | 5007.9 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Penal Code | 5008.2 | Amended Code | Citation Text |