CA AB443 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 27 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-06-16 - In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
Pending: Senate Business, Professions and Economic Development Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 27 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-06-16 - In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
Pending: Senate Business, Professions and Economic Development Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Sections 2168, 2168.1, and 2168.2 of, and to add Section 2112.5 to, the Business and Professions Code, relating to healing arts.
Title
Physicians and surgeons: fellowship programs: special faculty permits.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-05-27 - Assembly - AB 443 Carrillo Assembly Third Reading (Y: 77 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-12 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-27 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-12 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-27 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-06-16 | Senate | In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. |
2021-07-14 | Senate | In committee: Hearing for testimony only. |
2021-06-09 | Senate | Referred to Com. on B., P. & E.D. |
2021-05-28 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2021-05-27 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 77. Noes 0. Page 1586.) |
2021-05-13 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2021-05-12 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 16. Noes 0.) (May 12). |
2021-04-28 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 19. Noes 0.) (April 27). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2021-04-20 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on B. & P. |
2021-04-19 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on B. & P. Read second time and amended. |
2021-03-15 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on B. & P. |
2021-03-11 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on B. & P. Read second time and amended. |
2021-03-11 | Assembly | Referred to Coms. on B. & P. and HEALTH. |
2021-02-05 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 7. |
2021-02-04 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Business and Professions Code | 2112.5 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Business and Professions Code | 2168 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Business and Professions Code | 2168.1 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Business and Professions Code | 2168.2 | Amended Code | Citation Text |