CA AB44 | 2009-2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on September 30 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-09-30 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 564, Statutes of 2010.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on September 30 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-09-30 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 564, Statutes of 2010.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add Sections 5898.15, 5898.23, and 5899.2 to the Streets and Highways Code, relating to public improvements.
Title
Improvement Act of 1911: contractual assessments.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2010-08-30 - Assembly - AB 44 Blakeslee Concurrence in Senate Amendments By Smyth (Y: 73 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
2010-08-30 - Assembly - Senate amendments be concurred in (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2010-08-26 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB44 Blakeslee (Y: 27 N: 4 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2010-06-30 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 3 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-06-02 - Assembly - AB 44 BLAKESLEE Assembly Third Reading (Y: 77 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-05-28 - Assembly - Do pass as amended. (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-03-23 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-08-30 - Assembly - Senate amendments be concurred in (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2010-08-26 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB44 Blakeslee (Y: 27 N: 4 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2010-06-30 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 3 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-06-02 - Assembly - AB 44 BLAKESLEE Assembly Third Reading (Y: 77 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-05-28 - Assembly - Do pass as amended. (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-03-23 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-09-30 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 564, Statutes of 2010. | |
2010-09-30 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2010-09-13 | Enrolled and to the Governor at 5 p.m. | |
2010-08-30 | From committee: With recommendation: That Senate amendments be concurred in. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (August 30). Senate amendments concurred in. To enrollment. (Ayes 73. Noes 3. Page 6854.) | |
2010-08-27 | Joint Rule 62(a), file notice suspended. (Page 6773.) Re-referred to Com. on L. GOV. pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.2. | |
2010-08-26 | In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 28 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77. | |
2010-08-26 | Read third time, passed, and to Assembly. (Ayes 27. Noes 4. Page 4939.) | |
2010-08-20 | Read second time. To third reading. | |
2010-08-19 | Read third time, amended. To second reading. | |
2010-08-02 | Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading. (Corrected August 2.) | |
2010-07-15 | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 3. Noes 2.) (June 30). | |
2010-06-10 | Re-referred to Com. on L. GOV. | |
2010-06-07 | Withdrawn from committee. Re-referred to Com. on RLS. | |
2010-06-03 | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on E., U., & C. | |
2009-06-18 | Referred to Com. on E., U., & C. | |
2009-06-03 | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. | |
2009-06-02 | Read second time. To third reading. Read third time, passed, and to Senate. (Ayes 77. Noes 0. Page 1943.) | |
2009-06-01 | Read second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading. | |
2009-05-29 | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (May 28). | |
2009-04-23 | In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file. | |
2009-04-01 | Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | |
2009-03-31 | Read second time and amended. | |
2009-03-27 | From committee: Amend, do pass as amended, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 14. Noes 0.) (March 23). | |
2009-03-19 | Re-referred to Com. on U. & C. | |
2009-03-18 | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on U. & C. Read second time and amended. | |
2009-02-05 | Referred to Com. on U. & C. | |
2008-12-02 | From printer. May be heard in committee January 1. | |
2008-12-01 | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Streets and Highways Code | 5898.15 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Streets and Highways Code | 5898.23 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Streets and Highways Code | 5899.2 | New Code | See Bill Text |