CA AB438 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Passed on September 28 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-09-28 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 901, Statutes of 2024.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Passed on September 28 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-09-28 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 901, Statutes of 2024.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend, repeal, and add Sections 56043, 56341.5, and 56345 of the Education Code, relating to pupils with exceptional needs.
Title
Pupils with exceptional needs: individualized education programs: postsecondary goals and transition services.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-08-26 - Assembly - AB 438 Blanca Rubio Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 77 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2024-08-19 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB438 Blanca Rubio et al. By Portantino (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-09-12 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB438 Blanca Rubio et al. By Portantino Motion To Reconsider (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2023-09-12 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB438 Blanca Rubio et al. By Portantino (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2023-09-01 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-08-14 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-07-05 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with the recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-05-31 - Assembly - AB 438 Blanca Rubio Assembly Third Reading (Y: 80 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-05-18 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-03-22 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-08-19 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB438 Blanca Rubio et al. By Portantino (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-09-12 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB438 Blanca Rubio et al. By Portantino Motion To Reconsider (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2023-09-12 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB438 Blanca Rubio et al. By Portantino (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2023-09-01 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-08-14 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-07-05 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with the recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-05-31 - Assembly - AB 438 Blanca Rubio Assembly Third Reading (Y: 80 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-05-18 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-03-22 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-09-28 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 901, Statutes of 2024. | |
2024-09-28 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2024-09-03 | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3:30 p.m. | |
2024-08-26 | Assembly | Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 77. Noes 0. Page 6495.). |
2024-08-20 | Assembly | In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 22 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77. |
2024-08-19 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 40. Noes 0. Page 5199.). |
2024-03-06 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2024-03-05 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading. |
2024-03-05 | Senate | Ordered to second reading. |
2024-03-05 | Senate | From inactive file. |
2023-09-12 | Senate | Ordered to inactive file at the request of Senator Portantino. |
2023-09-12 | Senate | Reconsideration granted. (Ayes 37. Noes 0. Page 2624.) |
2023-09-12 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 30. Noes 0. Page 2624.) |
2023-09-11 | Senate | Ordered to third reading. |
2023-09-11 | Senate | From special consent calendar |
2023-09-08 | Senate | Ordered to special consent calendar. |
2023-09-05 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2023-09-01 | Senate | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (September 1). |
2023-08-14 | Senate | In committee: Referred to APPR suspense file. |
2023-07-05 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (July 5). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2023-06-19 | Senate | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on ED. |
2023-06-14 | Senate | Referred to Com. on ED. |
2023-06-01 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2023-05-31 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 80. Noes 0. Page 1979.) |
2023-05-18 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2023-05-18 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 15. Noes 0.) (May 18). |
2023-05-18 | Assembly | Coauthors revised. |
2023-04-19 | Assembly | In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file. |
2023-03-23 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (March 22). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2023-03-23 | Assembly | Coauthors revised. |
2023-02-17 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on ED. |
2023-02-07 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 9. |
2023-02-06 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Education Code | 56043 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Education Code | 56341.5 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Education Code | 56345 | New Code | See Bill Text |