CA AB436 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on August 7 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-08-07 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 166, Statutes of 2017.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on August 7 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-08-07 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 166, Statutes of 2017.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 12706.3 of the Water Code, relating to water.
Title
San Lorenzo River.
Sponsors
Asm. Mark Stone [D] |
Roll Calls
2017-07-20 - Senate - Consent Calendar 2nd AB436 (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-13 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with the recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-01 - Assembly - AB 436 STONE Assembly Third Reading (Y: 74 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-26 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-04 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-13 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with the recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-01 - Assembly - AB 436 STONE Assembly Third Reading (Y: 74 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-26 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-04 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-08-07 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 166, Statutes of 2017. | |
2017-08-07 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2017-07-31 | Assembly | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3:30 p.m. |
2017-07-20 | Assembly | In Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling. |
2017-07-20 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 2129.). |
2017-07-18 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar. |
2017-07-17 | Senate | From committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8 and ordered to consent calendar. |
2017-06-22 | Senate | In committee: Hearing postponed by committee. |
2017-06-13 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (June 13). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2017-05-10 | Senate | Referred to Com. on N.R. & W. |
2017-05-01 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2017-05-01 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 74. Noes 0. Page 1302.) |
2017-04-27 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2017-04-26 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 16. Noes 0.) (April 26). |
2017-04-04 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 13. Noes 0.) (April 4). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2017-02-27 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on W.,P., & W. |
2017-02-14 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 16. |
2017-02-13 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Water Code | 12706.3 | Amended Code | Citation Text |