CA AB432 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Vetoed on October 15 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-01-12 - Stricken from file.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Status: Vetoed on October 15 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-01-12 - Stricken from file.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 6253.2 of the Government Code, and to amend Sections 12301.6 and 14132.97 of the Welfare and Institutions Code, relating to personal care services.
Title
Personal care services.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-09-15 - Assembly - AB 432 Thurmond Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 75 N: 1 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-09-14 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB432 Thurmond By Mendoza (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-09-13 - Senate - That the measure be returned to Senate Floor for consideration. Ordered to third reading (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-09-01 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-08-21 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-07-11 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] with the recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-30 - Assembly - AB 432 THURMOND Assembly Third Reading (Y: 75 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-26 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-04 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-09-14 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB432 Thurmond By Mendoza (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-09-13 - Senate - That the measure be returned to Senate Floor for consideration. Ordered to third reading (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-09-01 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-08-21 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-07-11 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] with the recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-30 - Assembly - AB 432 THURMOND Assembly Third Reading (Y: 75 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-26 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-04 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-01-12 | Stricken from file. | |
2018-01-03 | Consideration of Governor's veto pending. | |
2017-10-15 | Vetoed by Governor. | |
2017-09-26 | Assembly | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3 p.m. |
2017-09-15 | Assembly | Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 75. Noes 1. Page 3522.). |
2017-09-15 | Assembly | In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. |
2017-09-14 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 2940.). |
2017-09-13 | Senate | From committee: That the measure be returned to Senate Floor for consideration. (Ayes 4. Noes 0.) (September 13) |
2017-09-11 | Senate | From committee: Be re-referred to Com. on HUMAN S. pursuant to Senate Rule 29.10(b). (Ayes 5. Noes 0.) Re-referred to Com. on HUMAN S. |
2017-09-11 | Senate | Re-referred to Com. on RLS. pursuant to Senate Rule 29.10(b). |
2017-09-11 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2017-09-08 | Senate | Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading. |
2017-09-05 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2017-09-01 | Senate | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (September 1). |
2017-08-21 | Senate | In committee: Referred to APPR. suspense file. |
2017-07-13 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2017-07-12 | Senate | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (July 11). |
2017-06-21 | Senate | In committee: Hearing postponed by committee. |
2017-06-08 | Senate | Referred to Com. on HUMAN S. |
2017-05-30 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2017-05-30 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 75. Noes 0. Page 1817.) |
2017-05-26 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2017-05-26 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (May 26). |
2017-04-26 | Assembly | In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file. |
2017-04-05 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (April 4). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2017-03-30 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on HUM. S. |
2017-03-29 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on HUM. S. Read second time and amended. |
2017-03-21 | Assembly | In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. |
2017-02-27 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on HUM. S. |
2017-02-14 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 16. |
2017-02-13 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Government Code | 6253.2 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Welfare and Institutions Code | 12300.5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Welfare and Institutions Code | 12301.6 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Welfare and Institutions Code | 14132.97 | Amended Code | Citation Text |