CA AB432 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 9 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-09-09 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 264, Statutes of 2013.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 9 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-09-09 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 264, Statutes of 2013.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add Section 19604.6 to the Business and Professions Code, relating to horse racing.
Title
Horse racing: exchange wagering.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-08-22 - Assembly - AB 432 PEREZ, V.M. Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 77 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2013-08-15 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB432 V. Manuel P (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-06-11 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-05-20 - Assembly - AB 432 PEREZ, V.M. Assembly Third Reading (Y: 73 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2013-05-08 - Assembly - Do pass, to Consent Calendar (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-24 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-08-15 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB432 V. Manuel P (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-06-11 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-05-20 - Assembly - AB 432 PEREZ, V.M. Assembly Third Reading (Y: 73 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2013-05-08 - Assembly - Do pass, to Consent Calendar (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-24 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-09-09 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 264, Statutes of 2013. | |
2013-09-09 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2013-08-29 | Assembly | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3:30 p.m. |
2013-08-22 | Assembly | Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 77. Noes 0. Page 2645.). |
2013-08-15 | Assembly | In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 17 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77. |
2013-08-15 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 1859.). |
2013-06-25 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2013-06-24 | Senate | From committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8. |
2013-06-19 | Senate | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2013-06-11 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (June 11). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2013-05-29 | Senate | Referred to Com. on G.O. |
2013-05-20 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2013-05-20 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 73. Noes 0. Page 1520.) |
2013-05-16 | Assembly | From consent calendar. Ordered to third reading. |
2013-05-13 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar. |
2013-05-09 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. To consent calendar. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (May 8). |
2013-04-25 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (April 24). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2013-04-10 | Assembly | In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. |
2013-02-28 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on G.O. |
2013-02-19 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 21. |
2013-02-15 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Business and Professions Code | 19604.6 | New Code | See Bill Text |