CA AB432 | 2009-2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 24 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-02-02 - From committee: Filed with the Chief Clerk pursuant to Joint Rule 56.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 24 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-02-02 - From committee: Filed with the Chief Clerk pursuant to Joint Rule 56.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add Section 399.23 to the Public Utilities Code, relating to energy.
Title
Renewable energy resources: solar feed-in tariff pilot
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-02-02 | From committee: Filed with the Chief Clerk pursuant to Joint Rule 56. | |
2010-01-31 | Died pursuant to Art. IV, Sec. 10(c) of the Constitution. | |
2009-04-20 | In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. | |
2009-04-13 | Re-referred to Com. on U. & C. | |
2009-04-02 | Referred to Coms. on U. & C. and NAT. RES. From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on U. & C. Read second time and amended. | |
2009-02-25 | From printer. May be heard in committee March 27. | |
2009-02-24 | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Public Utilities Code | 399.23 | New Code | See Bill Text |