CA AB43 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 13-0)
Status: Passed on October 8 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-10-08 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 690, Statutes of 2021.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

An act to amend Sections 627, 21400, 22352, 22354, 22358, and 40802 of, and to add Sections 22358.6, 22358.7, 22358.8, and 22358.9 to, the Vehicle Code, relating to traffic safety.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Traffic safety.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-09-09 - Assembly - AB 43 Friedman Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 68 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2021-09-08 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB43 Friedman et al. By Gonzalez (Y: 30 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2021-07-13 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 14 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-10 - Assembly - AB 43 Friedman Assembly Third Reading (Y: 65 N: 3 NV: 10 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-05 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 14 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-19 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-10-08 Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 690, Statutes of 2021.
2021-10-08 Approved by the Governor.
2021-09-17 Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3 p.m.
2021-09-09AssemblySenate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 68. Noes 5.).
2021-09-08AssemblyIn Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending.
2021-09-08SenateRead third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 30. Noes 5.).
2021-09-02SenateRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2021-09-01SenateRead third time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
2021-08-24SenateRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2021-08-23SenateRead third time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
2021-08-17SenateRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2021-08-16SenateFrom committee: Be ordered to second reading pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8.
2021-08-16SenateFrom committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2021-07-14SenateRead second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2021-07-13SenateFrom committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 14. Noes 1.) (July 13).
2021-07-06SenateFrom committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on TRANS.
2021-06-25SenateFrom committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on TRANS.
2021-05-19SenateReferred to Com. on TRANS.
2021-05-11SenateIn Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
2021-05-10AssemblyRead third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 65. Noes 3. Page 1360.)
2021-05-06AssemblyRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2021-05-05AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass. (Ayes 14. Noes 1.) (May 5).
2021-04-20AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 15. Noes 0.) (April 19). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2021-04-20AssemblyCoauthors revised.
2021-03-23AssemblyRe-referred to Com. on TRANS.
2021-03-22AssemblyFrom committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on TRANS. Read second time and amended.
2021-01-11AssemblyReferred to Com. on TRANS.
2020-12-08AssemblyFrom printer. May be heard in committee January 7.
2020-12-07AssemblyRead first time. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Vehicle Code21400Amended CodeCitation Text
Vehicle Code22352Amended CodeCitation Text
Vehicle Code22354Amended CodeCitation Text
Vehicle Code22358Amended CodeCitation Text
Vehicle Code22358.6New CodeSee Bill Text
Vehicle Code22358.7New CodeSee Bill Text
Vehicle Code22358.8New CodeSee Bill Text
Vehicle Code22358.9New CodeSee Bill Text
Vehicle Code40802Amended CodeCitation Text
Vehicle Code627Amended CodeCitation Text

California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback