CA AB43 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 21-0)
Status: Failed on November 30 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-11-30 - From Senate committee without further action.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

An act to add and repeal Section 17052.1 of the Revenue and Taxation Code, relating to taxation.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Personal income taxes: credit: earned income.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2015-08-17 - Senate - Placed on Appropriations Suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-07-08 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-03 - Assembly - AB 43 STONE Assembly Third Reading (Y: 69 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2015-05-28 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2015-05-18 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 6 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2016-11-30SenateFrom Senate committee without further action.
2015-08-27SenateIn committee: Held under submission.
2015-08-17SenateIn committee: Referred to APPR. suspense file.
2015-07-08SenateFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (July 8). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2015-06-30SenateIn committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
2015-06-18SenateReferred to Com. on GOV. & F.
2015-06-03SenateIn Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
2015-06-03AssemblyRead third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 69. Noes 3. Page 1859.)
2015-06-02AssemblyRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2015-06-01AssemblyRead second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading.
2015-05-28AssemblyJoint Rule 62(a), file notice suspended. (Page 1613.) From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 12. Noes 0.) (May 28).
2015-05-27AssemblyIn committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
2015-05-21AssemblyRe-referred to Com. on APPR.
2015-05-20AssemblyRead second time and amended.
2015-05-19AssemblyFrom committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 3.) (May 18).
2015-05-18AssemblyIn committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to REV. & TAX. suspense file.
2015-05-11AssemblyIn committee: Hearing postponed by committee.
2015-02-17AssemblyMeasure version as amended on February 12 corrected.
2015-02-13AssemblyRe-referred to Com. on REV. & TAX.
2015-02-12AssemblyFrom committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on REV. & TAX. Read second time and amended.
2015-02-05AssemblyRe-referred to Com. on REV. & TAX.
2015-02-04AssemblyFrom committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on REV. & TAX. Read second time and amended.
2015-02-02AssemblyReferred to Com. on REV. & TAX.
2014-12-02AssemblyFrom printer. May be heard in committee January 1.
2014-12-01AssemblyRead first time. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Revenue and Taxation Code17052.1New CodeSee Bill Text

California State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/cgi-bin/postquery?bill_number=ab_43&sess=1516&house=A
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/15-16/bill/asm/ab_0001-0050/ab_43_bill_20141201_introduced.html
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/15-16/bill/asm/ab_0001-0050/ab_43_bill_20150204_amended_asm_v98.html
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/15-16/bill/asm/ab_0001-0050/ab_43_bill_20150212_amended_asm_v97.html
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/15-16/bill/asm/ab_0001-0050/ab_43_bill_20150520_amended_asm_v96.html
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/15-16/bill/asm/ab_0001-0050/ab_43_bill_20150601_amended_asm_v95.html
Roll Callhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/15-16/bill/asm/ab_0001-0050/ab_43_vote_20150518_000001_asm_comm.html
Roll Callhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/15-16/bill/asm/ab_0001-0050/ab_43_vote_20150528_000001_asm_comm.html
Roll Callhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/15-16/bill/asm/ab_0001-0050/ab_43_vote_20150603_0218PM_asm_floor.html
Roll Callhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/15-16/bill/asm/ab_0001-0050/ab_43_vote_20150708_000001_sen_comm.html
Roll Callhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/15-16/bill/asm/ab_0001-0050/ab_43_vote_20150817_000001_sen_comm.html

Bill Comments 750

feedback