CA AB43 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on January 29 2014 - 50% progression
Action: 2014-08-14 - In committee: Held under submission.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

An act to amend Section 6901 of the Revenue and Taxation Code, relating to taxation.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Sales and use taxes: claim for refund: customer refunds.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2014-08-11 - Senate - Placed on Appropriations Suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-06-25 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-01-29 - Assembly - AB 43 BOCANEGRA Consent Calendar Second Day (Y: 78 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2014-01-23 - Assembly - Do pass, to Consent Calendar (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2014-01-13 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-05-06 - Assembly - Be referred to Committee on Revenue and Taxation (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2013-04-22 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Judiciary (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2014-08-14SenateIn committee: Held under submission.
2014-08-11SenateIn committee: Placed on APPR. suspense file.
2014-08-05SenateFrom committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2014-08-04SenateIn committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
2014-06-25SenateFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (June 25). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2014-06-12SenateIn committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
2014-06-02SenateIn committee: Hearing postponed by committee.
2014-02-06SenateReferred to Com. on GOV. & F.
2014-01-29SenateIn Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
2014-01-29AssemblyRead third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 78. Noes 0. Page 3726.)
2014-01-23AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass. To consent calendar. (Ayes 16. Noes 0.) (January 23). Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar.
2014-01-14AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (January 13). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2014-01-13AssemblyIn committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to REV. & TAX. suspense file.
2014-01-07AssemblyRe-referred to Com. on REV. & TAX.
2014-01-06AssemblyFrom committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on REV. & TAX. Read second time and amended.
2013-06-10AssemblyIn committee: Hearing postponed by committee.
2013-05-06AssemblyFrom committee: Be re-referred to Com. on REV. & TAX. Re-referred. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (May 6). Re-referred to Com. on REV. & TAX.
2013-05-02AssemblyRe-referred to Com. on RLS. pursuant to Assembly Rule 96.
2013-04-30AssemblyRe-referred to Com. on JUD.
2013-04-29AssemblyFrom committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on JUD. Read second time and amended.
2013-04-23AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on JUD. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (April 22). Re-referred to Com. on JUD.
2013-04-16AssemblyIn committee: Hearing postponed by committee.
2013-04-04AssemblyRe-referred to Coms. on REV. & TAX. and JUD. pursuant to Assembly Rule 96.
2013-03-20AssemblyRe-referred to Com. on JUD.
2013-03-19AssemblyReferred to Coms. on JUD. and REV. & TAX. From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on JUD. Read second time and amended.
2013-01-07AssemblyRead first time.
2012-12-17AssemblyFrom printer. May be heard in committee January 16.
2012-12-14AssemblyIntroduced. To print.

Code Citations


California State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/cgi-bin/postquery?bill_number=ab_43&sess=1314&house=A
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/13-14/bill/asm/ab_0001-0050/ab_43_bill_20121214_introduced.html
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/13-14/bill/asm/ab_0001-0050/ab_43_bill_20130319_amended_asm_v98.html
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/13-14/bill/asm/ab_0001-0050/ab_43_bill_20130429_amended_asm_v97.html
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/13-14/bill/asm/ab_0001-0050/ab_43_bill_20140106_amended_asm_v96.html
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/13-14/bill/asm/ab_0001-0050/ab_43_bill_20140805_amended_sen_v95.html
Roll Callhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/13-14/bill/asm/ab_0001-0050/ab_43_vote_20130422_000001_asm_comm.html
Roll Callhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/13-14/bill/asm/ab_0001-0050/ab_43_vote_20130506_000001_asm_comm.html
Roll Callhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/13-14/bill/asm/ab_0001-0050/ab_43_vote_20140113_000006_asm_comm.html
Roll Callhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/13-14/bill/asm/ab_0001-0050/ab_43_vote_20140123_000001_asm_comm.html
Roll Callhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/13-14/bill/asm/ab_0001-0050/ab_43_vote_20140129_1245PM_asm_floor.html
Roll Callhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/13-14/bill/asm/ab_0001-0050/ab_43_vote_20140625_000003_sen_comm.html
Roll Callhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/13-14/bill/asm/ab_0001-0050/ab_43_vote_20140811_000003_sen_comm.html

Bill Comments

feedback