CA AB43 | 2011-2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on January 23 2012 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-08-27 - Read second time. Ordered to third reading. Ordered to inactive file at the request of Senator Padilla.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on January 23 2012 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-08-27 - Read second time. Ordered to third reading. Ordered to inactive file at the request of Senator Padilla.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 12698.30 of the Insurance Code, and to amend Sections 14005.31, 14005.32, and 14132 of, to amend and repeal Sections 14011.16 and 14011.17 of, to amend, repeal, and add Sections 14005.18, 14005.28, 14005.30, 14005.37, and 14012 of, to add Sections 14005.60, 14005.62, 14005.63, 14005.64, 14132.02, and 15926.2 to, and to repeal Section 14008.85 of, the Welfare and Institutions Code, relating to health.
Title
Medi-Cal: eligibility.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-08-16 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-06-25 - Senate - Placed on Appropriations Suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-06-13 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-01-23 - Assembly - AB 43 MONNING Assembly Third Reading (Y: 49 N: 25 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2011-05-27 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 12 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-04-26 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 13 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-06-25 - Senate - Placed on Appropriations Suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-06-13 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-01-23 - Assembly - AB 43 MONNING Assembly Third Reading (Y: 49 N: 25 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2011-05-27 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 12 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-04-26 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 13 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-08-27 | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. Ordered to inactive file at the request of Senator Padilla. | |
2012-08-24 | Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading. | |
2012-08-20 | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. | |
2012-08-16 | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 5. Noes 2.) (August 16). | |
2012-06-25 | In committee: Placed on APPR. suspense file. | |
2012-06-14 | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 2.) (June 13). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | |
2012-02-02 | Referred to Com. on HEALTH. | |
2012-01-23 | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. | |
2012-01-23 | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 49. Noes 25. Page 3562.) | |
2012-01-17 | From inactive file. Ordered to third reading. | |
2012-01-13 | Notice of intention to remove from inactive file given by Assembly Member Monning. | |
2011-05-31 | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. Ordered to inactive file at the request of Assembly Member Monning. | |
2011-05-27 | From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 12. Noes 5.) (May 27). Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading. | |
2011-05-04 | In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file. | |
2011-04-27 | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 13. Noes 6.) (April 26). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | |
2011-04-25 | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on HEALTH. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on HEALTH. | |
2011-01-24 | Referred to Com. on HEALTH. | |
2010-12-07 | From printer. May be heard in committee January 6. | |
2010-12-06 | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Insurance Code | 12698.30 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Welfare and Institutions Code | 14005.18 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Welfare and Institutions Code | 14005.28 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Welfare and Institutions Code | 14005.30 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Welfare and Institutions Code | 14005.31 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Welfare and Institutions Code | 14005.32 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Welfare and Institutions Code | 14005.37 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Welfare and Institutions Code | 14005.60 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Welfare and Institutions Code | 14011.16 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |
Welfare and Institutions Code | 14011.17 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |
Welfare and Institutions Code | 14012 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Welfare and Institutions Code | 14132 | Amended Code | Citation Text |