CA AB428 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 31 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-07-31 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 137, Statutes of 2017.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

An act to amend Section 54953 of the Government Code, relating to local government.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Local government: the Ralph M. Brown Act.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-07-17 - Senate - Special Consent Calendar # AB428 (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-28 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-26 - Assembly - AB 428 RIDLEY-THOMAS Assembly Third Reading (Y: 76 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-10 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-07-31 Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 137, Statutes of 2017.
2017-07-31 Approved by the Governor.
2017-07-21AssemblyEnrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m.
2017-07-17AssemblyIn Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling.
2017-07-17SenateRead third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 2071.).
2017-07-11SenateOrdered to special consent calendar.
2017-06-29SenateRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2017-06-28SenateFrom committee: Do pass. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (June 28).
2017-06-08SenateReferred to Com. on GOV. & F.
2017-05-26SenateIn Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
2017-05-26AssemblyRead third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 76. Noes 0. Page 1711.)
2017-05-15AssemblyRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2017-05-11AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (May 10).
2017-04-05AssemblyIn committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
2017-02-21AssemblyReferred to Com. on L. GOV.
2017-02-10AssemblyFrom printer. May be heard in committee March 12.
2017-02-09AssemblyRead first time. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Government Code54953Amended CodeCitation Text

California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback