CA AB422 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-1)
Status: Passed on October 12 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-10-12 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 702, Statutes of 2017.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-1)
Status: Passed on October 12 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-10-12 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 702, Statutes of 2017.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to repeal and add Article 9 (commencing with Section 89280) of Chapter 2 of Part 55 of Division 8 of Title 3 of the Education Code, relating to nursing degrees.
Title
California State University: Doctor of Nursing Practice Degree Program.
Sponsors
Asm. Joaquin Arambula [D] | Asm. Sharon Quirk-Silva [D] | Sen. Josh Newman [D] | Sen. Jim Beall [D] |
Asm. Rocky Chavez [R] |
Roll Calls
2017-09-07 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB422 Arambula et al. By Newman (Y: 39 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-09-01 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-07-10 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-28 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-30 - Assembly - AB 422 ARAMBULA Assembly Third Reading (Y: 76 N: 1 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-26 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-14 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 12 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-09-01 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-07-10 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-28 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-30 - Assembly - AB 422 ARAMBULA Assembly Third Reading (Y: 76 N: 1 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-26 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-14 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 12 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-10-12 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 702, Statutes of 2017. | |
2017-10-12 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2017-09-13 | Assembly | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m. |
2017-09-07 | Assembly | In Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling. |
2017-09-07 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 39. Noes 1. Page 2581.). |
2017-09-05 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2017-09-01 | Senate | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (September 1). |
2017-07-10 | Senate | In committee: Referred to APPR. suspense file. |
2017-06-28 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (June 28). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2017-06-08 | Senate | Referred to Com. on ED. |
2017-05-30 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2017-05-30 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 76. Noes 1. Page 1783.) |
2017-05-26 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2017-05-26 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (May 26). |
2017-05-26 | Assembly | Coauthors revised. |
2017-04-05 | Assembly | In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file. |
2017-03-15 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 12. Noes 1.) (March 14). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2017-02-21 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on HIGHER ED. |
2017-02-10 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 12. |
2017-02-09 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Education Code | 89280 | New Code | See Bill Text |