CA AB422 | 2009-2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 23 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-02-02 - From committee: Filed with the Chief Clerk pursuant to Joint Rule 56.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 23 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-02-02 - From committee: Filed with the Chief Clerk pursuant to Joint Rule 56.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add Division 114 (commencing with Section 140000) to the Health and Safety Code, relating to youth and families.
Title
State Youth and Family Master Plan.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2009-04-14 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-02-02 | From committee: Filed with the Chief Clerk pursuant to Joint Rule 56. | |
2010-01-31 | Died pursuant to Art. IV, Sec. 10(c) of the Constitution. | |
2009-05-28 | In committee: Set, second hearing. Held under submission. | |
2009-04-29 | In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file. | |
2009-04-22 | Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | |
2009-04-21 | Read second time and amended. | |
2009-04-20 | From committee: Amend, do pass as amended, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 4. Noes 1.) (April 14). | |
2009-03-16 | Referred to Com. on HUM. S. | |
2009-02-24 | From printer. May be heard in committee March 26. | |
2009-02-23 | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Health and Safety Code | 140000 | New Code | See Bill Text |