CA AB419 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 16 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-07-16 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 91, Statutes of 2021.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 16 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-07-16 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 91, Statutes of 2021.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 1054.2 of the Penal Code, relating to criminal procedure.
Title
Criminal procedure: victim and witness privacy.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-07-05 - Senate - Special Consent AB419 (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-22 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-12 - Assembly - AB 419 Davies Assembly Third Reading (Y: 74 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-23 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-22 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-12 - Assembly - AB 419 Davies Assembly Third Reading (Y: 74 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-23 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-07-16 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 91, Statutes of 2021. | |
2021-07-16 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2021-07-08 | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 1 p.m. | |
2021-07-05 | Assembly | In Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling. |
2021-07-05 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 1805.). |
2021-06-30 | Senate | Ordered to special consent calendar. |
2021-06-23 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2021-06-22 | Senate | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 5. Noes 0.) (June 22). |
2021-05-12 | Senate | Referred to Com. on PUB. S. |
2021-04-12 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2021-04-12 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 74. Noes 0. Page 962.) |
2021-04-05 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2021-03-25 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading. |
2021-03-24 | Assembly | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (March 23). |
2021-03-10 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S. |
2021-03-09 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on PUB. S. Read second time and amended. |
2021-02-12 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on PUB. S. |
2021-02-05 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 7. |
2021-02-04 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Penal Code | 1054.2 | Amended Code | Citation Text |