CA AB416 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on October 10 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-10-10 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 653, Statutes of 2023.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

An act to amend Section 23398.5 of the Business and Professions Code, relating to alcoholic beverages.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Sale of shochu.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2023-09-07 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB416 Muratsuchi et al. By Durazo (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-06-13 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-03-30 - Assembly - AB 416 Muratsuchi Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 60 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 20) [PASS]
2023-03-22 - Assembly - Do pass. To Consent Calendar (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-03-08 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2023-10-10 Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 653, Statutes of 2023.
2023-10-10 Approved by the Governor.
2023-09-13 Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3 p.m.
2023-09-07AssemblyIn Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling.
2023-09-07SenateRead third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 2482.).
2023-06-27SenateRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2023-06-26SenateFrom committee: Be ordered to second reading pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8.
2023-06-13SenateFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 14. Noes 0.) (June 13). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2023-05-03SenateReferred to Com. on G.O.
2023-03-30SenateIn Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
2023-03-30AssemblyRead third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 65. Noes 0. Page 1008.)
2023-03-23AssemblyRead second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar.
2023-03-22AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 15. Noes 0.) (March 22).
2023-03-09AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 21. Noes 0.) (March 8). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2023-03-09AssemblyCoauthors revised.
2023-02-09AssemblyReferred to Com. on G.O.
2023-02-03AssemblyFrom printer. May be heard in committee March 5.
2023-02-02AssemblyRead first time. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Business and Professions Code23398.5Amended CodeCitation Text

California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback