CA AB416 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-0)
Status: Vetoed on October 5 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-10-05 - Vetoed by Governor.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

An act to add Sections 6105 and 10130 to the Public Contract Code, relating to public contracts.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

California Deforestation-Free Procurement Act: public works projects: wood and wood products.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-09-09 - Assembly - AB 416 Kalra Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 54 N: 21 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2021-09-08 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB416 Kalra et al. By Allen (Y: 30 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-08-26 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-08-16 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-07-06 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 11 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-02 - Assembly - AB 416 Kalra Assembly Third Reading (Y: 49 N: 19 NV: 11 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-20 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 12 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-28 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 4 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-10-05AssemblyVetoed by Governor.
2021-09-17 Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3 p.m.
2021-09-09AssemblySenate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 54. Noes 21.).
2021-09-08AssemblyIn Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending.
2021-09-08SenateRead third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 29. Noes 8.).
2021-09-07SenateRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2021-09-03SenateRead third time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
2021-08-26SenateRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2021-08-26SenateFrom committee: Do pass. (Ayes 5. Noes 2.) (August 26).
2021-08-16SenateIn committee: Referred to suspense file.
2021-07-07SenateRead second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2021-07-06SenateFrom committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 11. Noes 4.) (July 6).
2021-06-16SenateReferred to Com. on G.O.
2021-06-03SenateIn Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
2021-06-02AssemblyRead third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 49. Noes 19.)
2021-05-25AssemblyRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2021-05-24AssemblyRead second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading.
2021-05-20AssemblyFrom committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 12. Noes 4.) (May 20).
2021-05-20AssemblyJoint Rule 62(a), file notice suspended.
2021-05-19AssemblyIn committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
2021-04-29AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 4. Noes 3.) (April 28). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2021-04-21AssemblyRe-referred to Com. on A. & A.R.
2021-04-20AssemblyFrom committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on A. & A.R. Read second time and amended.
2021-02-12AssemblyReferred to Com. on A. & A.R.
2021-02-05AssemblyFrom printer. May be heard in committee March 7.
2021-02-04AssemblyRead first time. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Public Contract Code10130New CodeSee Bill Text
Public Contract Code6105New CodeSee Bill Text

California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback