CA AB408 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on September 30 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-09-30 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 904, Statutes of 2022.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on September 30 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-09-30 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 904, Statutes of 2022.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add Sections 48851.3 and 48852.3 to the Education Code, relating to homeless children and youths.
Title
Homeless children and youths: reporting.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-08-24 - Assembly - AB 408 Quirk-Silva Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 76 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2022-08-23 - Senate - Special Consent AB408 (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-08-11 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-08-01 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-06-08 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with the recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-01-27 - Assembly - AB 408 Quirk-Silva Assembly Third Reading (Y: 67 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2022-01-20 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-01-12 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-08-23 - Senate - Special Consent AB408 (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-08-11 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-08-01 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-06-08 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with the recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-01-27 - Assembly - AB 408 Quirk-Silva Assembly Third Reading (Y: 67 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2022-01-20 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-01-12 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-09-30 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 904, Statutes of 2022. | |
2022-09-30 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2022-08-31 | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m. | |
2022-08-24 | Assembly | Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 76. Noes 0.). |
2022-08-24 | Assembly | Assembly Rule 77(a) suspended. |
2022-08-23 | Assembly | In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 25 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77. |
2022-08-23 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 40. Noes 0. Page 4974.). |
2022-08-22 | Senate | Ordered to special consent calendar. |
2022-08-17 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2022-08-16 | Senate | Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading. |
2022-08-11 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2022-08-11 | Senate | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (August 11). |
2022-08-02 | Senate | In committee: Referred to suspense file. |
2022-06-08 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (June 8). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2022-05-04 | Senate | Referred to Com. on ED. |
2022-01-27 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2022-01-27 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 67. Noes 0. Page 3400.) |
2022-01-24 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2022-01-20 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 15. Noes 0.) (January 20). |
2022-01-12 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (January 12). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2022-01-04 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on ED. |
2022-01-03 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on ED. Read second time and amended. |
2021-02-12 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on ED. |
2021-02-04 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 6. |
2021-02-03 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Education Code | 48851.3 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Education Code | 48852.3 | New Code | See Bill Text |