CA AB407 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 20 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-08-30 - In committee: Held under submission.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

An act to amend Sections 107110 and 114870 of the Health and Safety Code, relating to public health.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Fluoroscopy and radiography permit or certification and continuing education: exceptions.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-08-12 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-24 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 8 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-20 - Assembly - AB 407 Santiago Assembly Third Reading (Y: 74 N: 2 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-08 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-23 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-09 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Business and Professions] (Y: 14 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-08-30SenateIn committee: Held under submission.
2019-08-12SenateIn committee: Referred to APPR. suspense file.
2019-07-01SenateRead second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2019-06-27SenateFrom committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 8. Noes 1.) (June 24).
2019-06-17SenateFrom committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on B., P. & E.D.
2019-05-29SenateReferred to Com. on B., P. & E.D.
2019-05-20SenateIn Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
2019-05-20AssemblyRead third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 74. Noes 2. Page 1724.)
2019-05-09AssemblyRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2019-05-08AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass. (Ayes 18. Noes 0.) (May 8).
2019-04-24AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 20. Noes 0.) (April 23). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2019-04-22AssemblyRe-referred to Com. on B. & P.
2019-04-11AssemblyRead second time and amended.
2019-04-10AssemblyFrom committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on B. & P. (Ayes 14. Noes 1.) (April 9).
2019-04-01AssemblyRe-referred to Com. on HEALTH.
2019-03-28AssemblyFrom committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on HEALTH. Read second time and amended.
2019-03-28AssemblyReferred to Coms. on HEALTH and B. & P.
2019-02-08AssemblyFrom printer. May be heard in committee March 10.
2019-02-07AssemblyRead first time. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Health and Safety Code107110Amended CodeCitation Text
Health and Safety Code114870Amended CodeCitation Text

California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback