CA AB406 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on February 1 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-02-01 - From committee: Filed with the Chief Clerk pursuant to Joint Rule 56.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on February 1 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-02-01 - From committee: Filed with the Chief Clerk pursuant to Joint Rule 56.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 569 of, and to add and repeal Section 569.1 of, the Food and Agricultural Code, relating to agriculture.
Title
Agriculture: Healthy Soils Program: organic production.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-03-15 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-02-01 | Assembly | From committee: Filed with the Chief Clerk pursuant to Joint Rule 56. |
2024-01-31 | Assembly | Died pursuant to Art. IV, Sec. 10(c) of the Constitution. |
2023-05-18 | Assembly | In committee: Hearing postponed by committee. |
2023-03-29 | Assembly | In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file. |
2023-03-16 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 1.) (March 15). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2023-03-13 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on AGRI. |
2023-03-09 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on AGRI. Read second time and amended. |
2023-02-09 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on AGRI. |
2023-02-03 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 5. |
2023-02-02 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Food and Agricultural Code | 569 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Food and Agricultural Code | 569.1 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |