CA AB403 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on February 1 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-02-01 - From committee: Filed with the Chief Clerk pursuant to Joint Rule 56.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on February 1 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-02-01 - From committee: Filed with the Chief Clerk pursuant to Joint Rule 56.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Sections 127345, 127346, 127350, 127355 of, and to repeal and add Section 127340 of, the Health and Safety Code, relating to health care.
Title
Health systems: community benefits plan.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-02-01 | Assembly | From committee: Filed with the Chief Clerk pursuant to Joint Rule 56. |
2024-01-31 | Assembly | Died pursuant to Art. IV, Sec. 10(c) of the Constitution. |
2023-04-12 | Assembly | In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. |
2023-03-27 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on HEALTH. |
2023-03-23 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on HEALTH. Read second time and amended. |
2023-03-23 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on HEALTH. |
2023-02-03 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 5. |
2023-02-02 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Health and Safety Code | 127340 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Health and Safety Code | 127345 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Health and Safety Code | 127346 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Health and Safety Code | 127350 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Health and Safety Code | 127355 | Amended Code | Citation Text |