CA AB403 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Failed on February 1 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-02-01 - From committee: Filed with the Chief Clerk pursuant to Joint Rule 56.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Failed on February 1 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-02-01 - From committee: Filed with the Chief Clerk pursuant to Joint Rule 56.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add Chapter 6.1 (commencing with Section 66420) to Part 40 of Division 5 of Title 3 of the Education Code, relating to postsecondary education.
Title
Fair Access to College Textbooks Act.
Sponsors
Asm. Rob Bonta [D] | Asm. Ash Kalra [D] | Asm. Rudy Salas [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-02-01 | Assembly | From committee: Filed with the Chief Clerk pursuant to Joint Rule 56. |
2022-01-31 | Assembly | Died pursuant to Art. IV, Sec. 10(c) of the Constitution. |
2021-03-26 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on HIGHER ED. |
2021-03-25 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on HIGHER ED. Read second time and amended. |
2021-02-12 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on HIGHER ED. |
2021-02-04 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 6. |
2021-02-03 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Education Code | 66420 | New Code | See Bill Text |