CA AB403 | 2009-2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on August 6 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-08-06 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 104, Statutes of 2009.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on August 6 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-08-06 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 104, Statutes of 2009.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 1917 of the Business and Professions Code, relating to dental hygienists.
Title
Dental hygienists: examinations and licensure.
Sponsors
Sen. Jean Fuller [R] |
Roll Calls
2009-06-29 - Senate - Special Consent #11 AB403 Fuller (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2009-06-08 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2009-05-04 - Assembly - AB 403 FULLER Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 79 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2009-04-22 - Assembly - Do pass, to Consent Calendar (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2009-03-31 - Assembly - Do pass and re-refer to Committee on Appropriations with recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2009-06-08 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2009-05-04 - Assembly - AB 403 FULLER Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 79 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2009-04-22 - Assembly - Do pass, to Consent Calendar (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2009-03-31 - Assembly - Do pass and re-refer to Committee on Appropriations with recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-08-06 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 104, Statutes of 2009. | |
2009-08-05 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2009-07-30 | Enrolled and to the Governor at 1 p.m. | |
2009-06-29 | In Assembly. To enrollment. | |
2009-06-29 | Read third time, passed, and to Assembly. (Ayes 40. Noes 0. Page 1520.) | |
2009-06-25 | Ordered to Special Consent Calendar. | |
2009-06-24 | Read second time. To third reading. | |
2009-06-23 | From committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8. | |
2009-06-08 | From committee: Do pass, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. Re-referred. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (June 8). | |
2009-05-14 | Referred to Com. on B., P. & E.D. | |
2009-05-04 | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. | |
2009-05-04 | Read third time, passed, and to Senate. (Ayes 79. Noes 0. Page 1240.) | |
2009-04-27 | Read second time. To Consent Calendar. | |
2009-04-23 | From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (April 22). | |
2009-03-31 | From committee: Do pass, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. Re-referred. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (March 31). | |
2009-03-26 | Re-referred to Com. on B. & P. | |
2009-03-25 | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on B. & P. Read second time and amended. | |
2009-03-09 | Referred to Com. on B. & P. | |
2009-02-24 | From printer. May be heard in committee March 26. | |
2009-02-23 | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Business and Professions Code | 1917 | Amended Code | Citation Text |