CA AB401 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on January 22 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-01-22 - From committee: Without further action pursuant to Joint Rule 62(a).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on January 22 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-01-22 - From committee: Without further action pursuant to Joint Rule 62(a).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Sections 23550, 23550.5, 23594, and 23596 of the Vehicle Code, relating to vehicles.
Title
Vehicles: driving under the influence.
Sponsors
Asm. Heath Flora [R] |
Roll Calls
2020-01-14 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 3 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-03-19 - Assembly - Reconsideration (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-12 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 2 N: 5 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-03-19 - Assembly - Reconsideration (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-12 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 2 N: 5 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-01-22 | Assembly | From committee: Without further action pursuant to Joint Rule 62(a). |
2020-01-14 | Assembly | In committee: Set, second hearing. Failed passage. |
2019-03-19 | Assembly | In committee: Reconsideration granted. |
2019-03-12 | Assembly | In committee: Set, first hearing. Failed passage. |
2019-03-05 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S. |
2019-03-04 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on PUB. S. Read second time and amended. |
2019-02-15 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on PUB. S. |
2019-02-07 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 9. |
2019-02-06 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Vehicle Code | 23550 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Vehicle Code | 23550.5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Vehicle Code | 23594 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Vehicle Code | 23596 | Amended Code | Citation Text |