CA AB400 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 22 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-09-22 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 201, Statutes of 2023.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 22 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-09-22 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 201, Statutes of 2023.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Sections 22161 and 22169 of the Public Contract Code, relating to public contracts.
Title
Local agency design-build projects: authorization.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-08-28 - Assembly - AB 400 Blanca Rubio Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 76 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2023-07-13 - Senate - Consent Calendar AB400 Blanca Rubio (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2023-06-21 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with the recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-05-18 - Assembly - AB 400 Blanca Rubio Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 74 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2023-05-10 - Assembly - Do pass. To Consent Calendar (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-04-26 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-07-13 - Senate - Consent Calendar AB400 Blanca Rubio (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2023-06-21 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with the recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-05-18 - Assembly - AB 400 Blanca Rubio Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 74 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2023-05-10 - Assembly - Do pass. To Consent Calendar (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-04-26 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-09-22 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 201, Statutes of 2023. | |
2023-09-22 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2023-09-05 | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3 p.m. | |
2023-08-28 | Assembly | Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 76. Noes 0. Page 2820.). |
2023-07-13 | Assembly | In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 11 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77. |
2023-07-13 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 37. Noes 0. Page 2036.). |
2023-07-05 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar. |
2023-07-03 | Senate | From committee: Be ordered to second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8 and ordered to Consent Calendar. |
2023-06-21 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (June 21). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2023-06-13 | Senate | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on GOV. & F. |
2023-06-08 | Senate | In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. |
2023-05-31 | Senate | Referred to Com. on GOV. & F. |
2023-05-18 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2023-05-18 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 74. Noes 0. Page 1594.) |
2023-05-11 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar. |
2023-05-10 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 14. Noes 0.) (May 10). |
2023-05-02 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2023-05-01 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. |
2023-04-27 | Assembly | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (April 26). |
2023-02-09 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on L. GOV. |
2023-02-03 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 5. |
2023-02-02 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Public Contract Code | 22161 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Public Contract Code | 22169 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |