CA AB400 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-1-1)
Status: Failed on February 1 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-02-01 - From committee: Filed with the Chief Clerk pursuant to Joint Rule 56.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-1-1)
Status: Failed on February 1 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-02-01 - From committee: Filed with the Chief Clerk pursuant to Joint Rule 56.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add Chapter 2.5 (commencing with Section 501) to Part 1 of Division 1 of the Unemployment Insurance Code, relating to unemployment insurance.
Title
Unemployment insurance: Unemployment Insurance Oversight Advisory Board.
Sponsors
Asm. David Chiu [D] | Asm. Tom Lackey [R] | Asm. Chad Mayes [I] | Asm. Adrin Nazarian [D] |
Asm. Cottie Petrie-Norris [D] | Asm. Miguel Santiago [D] | Asm. Buffy Wicks [D] |
Roll Calls
2021-04-29 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-02-01 | Assembly | From committee: Filed with the Chief Clerk pursuant to Joint Rule 56. |
2022-01-31 | Assembly | Died pursuant to Art. IV, Sec. 10(c) of the Constitution. |
2021-05-20 | Assembly | In committee: Held under submission. |
2021-05-12 | Assembly | In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file. |
2021-04-29 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 13. Noes 0.) (April 29). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2021-04-22 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on INS. |
2021-04-21 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on INS. Read second time and amended. |
2021-02-12 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on INS. |
2021-02-04 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 6. |
2021-02-03 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Unemployment Insurance Code | 501 | New Code | See Bill Text |