CA AB40 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on October 9 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-10-09 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 607, Statutes of 2017.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

An act to amend Section 11165.1 of the Health and Safety Code, relating to controlled substances, and declaring the urgency thereof, to take effect immediately.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

CURES database: health information technology system.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-09-14 - Assembly - AB 40 Santiago Special Consent Calendar 1st Day (Y: 79 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-09-14 - Senate - Special Consent Calendar # AB40 Santiago By Lara Urgency Clause (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-09-01 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-08-28 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-07-18 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-07-03 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Judiciary] (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-31 - Assembly - AB 40 SANTIAGO Third Reading Urgency (Y: 77 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-26 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-25 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-04 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Public Safety] (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-10-09 Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 607, Statutes of 2017.
2017-10-09 Approved by the Governor.
2017-09-25AssemblyEnrolled and presented to the Governor at 12 p.m.
2017-09-14AssemblySenate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 79. Noes 0. Page 3421.).
2017-09-14AssemblyOrdered to special consent calendar.
2017-09-14AssemblyIn Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending.
2017-09-14SenateRead third time. Urgency clause adopted. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 40. Noes 0. Page 2912.).
2017-09-12SenateOrdered to special consent calendar.
2017-09-11SenateRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2017-09-08SenateRead third time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
2017-09-05SenateRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2017-09-01SenateRead second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading.
2017-09-01SenateFrom committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (September 1).
2017-08-28SenateIn committee: Referred to APPR. suspense file.
2017-08-22SenateRead second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2017-08-21SenateFrom committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (July 18).
2017-07-10SenateFrom committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on JUD.
2017-07-05SenateRead second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on JUD.
2017-07-03SenateFrom committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on JUD. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (July 3).
2017-06-19SenateIn committee: Hearing postponed by committee.
2017-06-14SenateReferred to Coms. on B., P. & E.D. and JUD.
2017-06-01SenateIn Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
2017-05-31AssemblyRead third time. Urgency clause adopted. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 77. Noes 0. Page 1922.).
2017-05-30AssemblyRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2017-05-26AssemblyRead second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading.
2017-05-26AssemblyFrom committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 16. Noes 0.) (May 26).
2017-05-17AssemblyIn committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
2017-05-10AssemblyIn committee: Hearing postponed by committee.
2017-04-25AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (April 25). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2017-04-20AssemblyRe-referred to Com. on PUB. S.
2017-04-19AssemblyFrom committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on PUB. S. Read second time and amended.
2017-04-04AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on PUB. S. (Ayes 15. Noes 0.) (April 4). Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S.
2017-01-19AssemblyReferred to Coms. on B. & P. and PUB. S.
2016-12-06AssemblyFrom printer. May be heard in committee January 5.
2016-12-05AssemblyRead first time. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Health and Safety Code11165.1Amended CodeCitation Text
Health and Safety Code11165.2Amended CodeCitation Text

California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback