CA AB397 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on May 23 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-07-11 - Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
Pending: Senate Appropriations Committee
Hearing: Aug 12 @ 10:00 am in John L. Burton Hearing Room
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

An act to amend Section 23222 of, and to add Section 23155 to, the Vehicle Code, relating to driving under the influence.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Vehicles: driving under the influence.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-05-23 - Assembly - AB 397 Chau Assembly Third Reading (Y: 78 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-16 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-19 - Assembly - Do pass as amended, and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-07-11SenateRead second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2019-07-11SenateFrom committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (July 9).
2019-06-26SenateRe-referred to Com. on PUB. S.
2019-06-18SenateFrom committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on RLS.
2019-06-06SenateReferred to Com. on RLS.
2019-05-24SenateIn Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
2019-05-23AssemblyRead third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 78. Noes 0. Page 1931.)
2019-05-20AssemblyRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2019-05-16AssemblyRead second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading.
2019-05-16AssemblyFrom committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 18. Noes 0.) (May 16).
2019-04-03AssemblyIn committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
2019-03-25AssemblyRe-referred to Com. on APPR.
2019-03-21AssemblyRead second time and amended.
2019-03-20AssemblyFrom committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (March 19).
2019-02-15AssemblyReferred to Com. on PUB. S.
2019-02-07AssemblyFrom printer. May be heard in committee March 9.
2019-02-06AssemblyRead first time. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Vehicle Code1821Amended CodeCitation Text
Vehicle Code23152New CodeSee Bill Text
Vehicle Code23153New CodeSee Bill Text
Vehicle Code23155New CodeSee Bill Text
Vehicle Code23222Amended CodeCitation Text

California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback