CA AB395 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-1)
Status: Failed on February 3 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-02-03 - From committee: Filed with the Chief Clerk pursuant to Joint Rule 56.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-1)
Status: Failed on February 3 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-02-03 - From committee: Filed with the Chief Clerk pursuant to Joint Rule 56.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add Section 1538.1 to the Health and Safety Code, and to amend Sections 11166, 11166.1, 11166.3, and 11167.5 of the Penal Code, relating to child abuse or neglect.
Title
Child abuse or neglect: foster children.
Sponsors
Asm. Blanca Rubio [D] | Sen. Jim Beall [D] | Asm. Kansen Chu [D] | Asm. Mike Gipson [D] |
Asm. Tom Lackey [R] | Asm. Brian Maienschein [D] | Asm. Mark Stone [D] |
Roll Calls
2019-04-23 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-09 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Public Safety] (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-09 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Public Safety] (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-03 | Assembly | From committee: Filed with the Chief Clerk pursuant to Joint Rule 56. |
2020-01-31 | Assembly | Died pursuant to Art. IV, Sec. 10(c) of the Constitution. |
2020-01-23 | Assembly | In committee: Held under submission. |
2019-05-16 | Assembly | In committee: Hearing postponed by committee. |
2019-05-08 | Assembly | In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file. |
2019-04-24 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (April 23). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2019-04-10 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on PUB. S. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (April 9). Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S. |
2019-04-04 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on HUM. S. |
2019-04-03 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on HUM. S. Read second time and amended. |
2019-03-26 | Assembly | In committee: Hearing postponed by committee. |
2019-03-21 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on HUM. S. |
2019-03-20 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on HUM. S. Read second time and amended. |
2019-03-12 | Assembly | In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. |
2019-02-15 | Assembly | Referred to Coms. on HUM. S. and PUB. S. |
2019-02-07 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 9. |
2019-02-06 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Health and Safety Code | 1538.1 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Penal Code | 11166 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Penal Code | 11166.1 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Penal Code | 11166.3 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Penal Code | 11167.5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |