CA AB392 | 2011-2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 14 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-02-01 - Died pursuant to Art. IV, Sec. 10(c) of the Constitution. From committee: Filed with the Chief Clerk pursuant to Joint Rule 56.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 14 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-02-01 - Died pursuant to Art. IV, Sec. 10(c) of the Constitution. From committee: Filed with the Chief Clerk pursuant to Joint Rule 56.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Sections 54954.2 and 54957.5 of the Government Code, relating to public meetings.
Title
Ralph M. Brown Act: posting agendas.
Sponsors
Asm. Luis Alejo [D] |
Roll Calls
2011-04-27 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-02-01 | Died pursuant to Art. IV, Sec. 10(c) of the Constitution. From committee: Filed with the Chief Clerk pursuant to Joint Rule 56. | |
2011-05-27 | In committee: Set, second hearing. Held under submission. | |
2011-05-11 | In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file. | |
2011-04-28 | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 1.) (April 27). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | |
2011-04-25 | Re-referred to Com. on L. GOV. | |
2011-04-14 | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on L. GOV. Read second time and amended. | |
2011-03-29 | In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. | |
2011-03-03 | Referred to Coms. on L. GOV. and G.O. | |
2011-02-15 | From printer. May be heard in committee March 17. | |
2011-02-14 | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Government Code | 54954.2 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Government Code | 54957.5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |