CA AB388 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 27 2017 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-09-01 - In committee: Held under submission.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on April 27 2017 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-09-01 - In committee: Held under submission.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 39712 of the Health and Safety Code, relating to greenhouse gases.
Title
Greenhouse Gas Reduction Fund: wetland restoration projects.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-08-21 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-07-11 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-21 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Natural Resources and Water] (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-27 - Assembly - AB 388 MULLIN Assembly Third Reading (Y: 73 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-05 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-20 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-07-11 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-21 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Natural Resources and Water] (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-27 - Assembly - AB 388 MULLIN Assembly Third Reading (Y: 73 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-05 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-20 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-09-01 | Senate | In committee: Held under submission. |
2017-08-21 | Senate | In committee: Referred to APPR. suspense file. |
2017-07-11 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (July 11). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2017-06-22 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on N.R. & W. |
2017-06-21 | Senate | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on N.R. & W. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (June 21). |
2017-06-05 | Senate | In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. |
2017-05-10 | Senate | Referred to Coms. on EQ. and N.R. & W. |
2017-04-27 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2017-04-27 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 73. Noes 0. Page 1263.) |
2017-04-06 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2017-04-05 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (April 5). |
2017-03-27 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2017-03-23 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. |
2017-03-22 | Assembly | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (March 20). |
2017-03-06 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on NAT. RES. |
2017-03-02 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on NAT. RES. Read second time and amended. |
2017-02-21 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on NAT. RES. |
2017-02-10 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 12. |
2017-02-09 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Health and Safety Code | 39712 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Health and Safety Code | 39719 | Amended Code | Citation Text |