CA AB387 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Engrossed on April 17 2023 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-09-01 - In committee: Held under submission.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on April 17 2023 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-09-01 - In committee: Held under submission.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 1568.17 of the Health and Safety Code, relating to Alzheimer’s disease.
Title
Alzheimer’s disease.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-06-26 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-06-07 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with the recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-04-17 - Assembly - AB 387 Aguiar-Curry Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 79 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-03-29 - Assembly - Do pass. To Consent Calendar (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-03-14 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-06-07 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with the recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-04-17 - Assembly - AB 387 Aguiar-Curry Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 79 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-03-29 - Assembly - Do pass. To Consent Calendar (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-03-14 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-09-01 | Senate | In committee: Held under submission. |
2023-06-26 | Senate | In committee: Referred to APPR. suspense file. |
2023-06-07 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 12. Noes 0.) (June 7). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2023-05-30 | Senate | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on HEALTH. |
2023-05-03 | Senate | Referred to Com. on HEALTH. |
2023-04-18 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2023-04-17 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 79. Noes 0. Page 1178.) |
2023-03-30 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar. |
2023-03-29 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 14. Noes 0.) (March 29). |
2023-03-15 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 13. Noes 0.) (March 14). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2023-02-09 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on HEALTH. |
2023-02-03 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 5. |
2023-02-02 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Health and Safety Code | 1568.17 | Amended Code | Citation Text |