CA AB386 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 8 2017 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-08-16 - In committee: Held under submission.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 8 2017 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-08-16 - In committee: Held under submission.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add Section 17654 to the Education Code, relating to school facilities.
Title
School facilities: Efficiency and Sustainability Projects for Schools Pilot Program.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-08-06 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-27 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-09-01 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-08-21 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-07-11 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-13 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Judiciary] (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-08 - Assembly - AB 386 GONZALEZ FLETCHER Assembly Third Reading (Y: 69 N: 0 NV: 11 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-05 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 12 N: 2 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-14 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 8 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-27 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-09-01 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-08-21 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-07-11 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-13 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Judiciary] (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-08 - Assembly - AB 386 GONZALEZ FLETCHER Assembly Third Reading (Y: 69 N: 0 NV: 11 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-05 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 12 N: 2 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-14 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 8 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-08-16 | Senate | In committee: Held under submission. |
2018-08-06 | Senate | In committee: Referred to APPR. suspense file. |
2018-07-03 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2018-07-02 | Senate | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (June 27). |
2018-06-20 | Senate | Re-referred to Com. on ED. |
2018-06-14 | Senate | Re-referred to Com. on RLS. pursuant to Senate Rule 29.10(c). |
2018-06-12 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2018-06-11 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading. |
2018-06-11 | Senate | Ordered to second reading. |
2018-06-11 | Senate | From inactive file. |
2017-09-15 | Senate | Ordered to inactive file at the request of Senator Monning. |
2017-09-05 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2017-09-01 | Senate | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 5. Noes 0.) (September 1). |
2017-08-21 | Senate | In committee: Referred to APPR. suspense file. |
2017-07-12 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (July 11). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2017-06-14 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on JUD. (Ayes 4. Noes 0.) (June 13). Re-referred to Com. on JUD. |
2017-05-18 | Senate | Referred to Coms. on HUMAN S. and JUD. |
2017-05-08 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2017-05-08 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 69. Noes 0. Page 1418.) |
2017-05-04 | Assembly | Read third time and amended. Ordered to third reading. (Page 1374.) |
2017-04-20 | Assembly | Read third time and amended. Ordered to third reading. (Page 1134.) |
2017-04-17 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2017-04-06 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading. |
2017-04-05 | Assembly | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 12. Noes 2.) (April 5). |
2017-03-30 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2017-03-29 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. Read second time and amended. |
2017-03-21 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2017-03-20 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. |
2017-03-16 | Assembly | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 8. Noes 1.) (March 14). |
2017-02-21 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on JUD. |
2017-02-10 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 12. |
2017-02-09 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Education Code | 17654 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Welfare and Institutions Code | 13300 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Welfare and Institutions Code | 13400 | New Code | See Bill Text |