CA AB384 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 29 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-08-30 - In committee: Held under submission.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 29 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-08-30 - In committee: Held under submission.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Sections 56.05 and 56.06 of the Civil Code, relating to privacy.
Title
Information privacy: digital health feedback systems.
Sponsors
Asm. Edwin Chau [D] |
Roll Calls
2019-08-12 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-07-09 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-07-03 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Judiciary] (Y: 7 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-29 - Assembly - AB 384 Chau Assembly Third Reading (Y: 57 N: 15 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-01 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 13 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-23 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 9 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-26 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Privacy and Consumer Protection] (Y: 10 N: 3 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-07-09 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-07-03 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Judiciary] (Y: 7 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-29 - Assembly - AB 384 Chau Assembly Third Reading (Y: 57 N: 15 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-01 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 13 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-23 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 9 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-26 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Privacy and Consumer Protection] (Y: 10 N: 3 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-08-30 | Senate | In committee: Held under submission. |
2019-08-12 | Senate | In committee: Referred to APPR. suspense file. |
2019-07-10 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 1.) (July 9). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2019-07-05 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on JUD. (Ayes 7. Noes 1.) (July 3). Re-referred to Com. on JUD. |
2019-06-25 | Senate | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on HEALTH. |
2019-06-12 | Senate | Referred to Coms. on HEALTH and JUD. |
2019-05-30 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2019-05-29 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 57. Noes 15. Page 2070.) |
2019-05-02 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2019-05-01 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 13. Noes 5.) (May 1). |
2019-04-24 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 9. Noes 2.) (April 23). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2019-03-27 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on P. & C.P. (Ayes 10. Noes 3.) (March 26). Re-referred to Com. on P. & C.P. |
2019-03-19 | Assembly | In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. |
2019-02-15 | Assembly | Referred to Coms. on HEALTH and P. & C.P. |
2019-02-06 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 8. |
2019-02-05 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Civil Code | 56.05 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Civil Code | 56.06 | Amended Code | Citation Text |