CA AB383 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 1 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-09-01 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 189, Statutes of 2017.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 1 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-09-01 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 189, Statutes of 2017.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add Section 2016.080 to the Code of Civil Procedure, relating to civil actions.
Title
Civil actions: discovery status conference.
Sponsors
Asm. Edwin Chau [D] |
Roll Calls
2017-08-21 - Assembly - AB 383 CHAU Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 78 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-07-17 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB383 Chau By Jackson (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-20 - Senate - Do pass as amended, and be ordered to the Consent Calendar (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-23 - Assembly - AB 383 CHAU Assembly Third Reading (Y: 76 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-14 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-07-17 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB383 Chau By Jackson (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-20 - Senate - Do pass as amended, and be ordered to the Consent Calendar (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-23 - Assembly - AB 383 CHAU Assembly Third Reading (Y: 76 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-14 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-09-01 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 189, Statutes of 2017. | |
2017-09-01 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2017-08-25 | Assembly | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3 p.m. |
2017-08-21 | Assembly | Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 78. Noes 0. Page 2678.). |
2017-07-17 | Assembly | In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after July 19 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77. |
2017-07-17 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 40. Noes 0. Page 2076.). |
2017-07-10 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2017-07-06 | Senate | Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading. |
2017-06-29 | Senate | Ordered to third reading. |
2017-06-29 | Senate | From Consent Calendar. |
2017-06-27 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Ordered to consent calendar. |
2017-06-26 | Senate | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (June 20). |
2017-06-13 | Senate | Measure version as amended on June 12 corrected. |
2017-06-12 | Senate | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on JUD. |
2017-05-31 | Senate | In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. |
2017-05-10 | Senate | Referred to Com. on JUD. |
2017-03-23 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2017-03-23 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 76. Noes 0. Page 722.) |
2017-03-20 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2017-03-16 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading. |
2017-03-15 | Assembly | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (March 14). |
2017-02-21 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on JUD. |
2017-02-10 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 12. |
2017-02-09 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Code of Civil Procedure | 2016.080 | New Code | See Bill Text |