CA AB381 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on October 1 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-10-01 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 437, Statutes of 2021.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

An act to amend Sections 11834.026 and 11834.26 of the Health and Safety Code, relating to substance use disorder.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Licensed facilities: duties.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-09-01 - Assembly - AB 381 Davies Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 78 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-08-30 - Senate - Consent Calendar AB381 (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-06-22 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with the recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-10 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Judiciary] (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-22 - Assembly - AB 381 Davies Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 77 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-14 - Assembly - Do pass. To Consent Calendar (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-23 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Judiciary] (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-10-01 Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 437, Statutes of 2021.
2021-10-01 Approved by the Governor.
2021-09-08 Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4:30 p.m.
2021-09-01AssemblySenate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 78. Noes 0.).
2021-09-01AssemblyAssembly Rule 77 suspended. (Ayes 54. Noes 16.)
2021-08-31AssemblyIn Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after September 2 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
2021-08-30SenateRead third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 39. Noes 0.).
2021-08-16SenateRead second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar.
2021-07-15SenateFrom committee: Be ordered to second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8 and ordered to Consent Calendar.
2021-06-30SenateIn committee: Hearing postponed by committee.
2021-06-23SenateFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (June 22). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2021-06-14SenateRead second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on JUD.
2021-06-10SenateFrom committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on JUD. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (June 10).
2021-05-12SenateReferred to Coms. on HEALTH and JUD.
2021-04-26SenateIn Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
2021-04-22AssemblyRead third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 77. Noes 0. Page 1152.)
2021-04-15AssemblyRead second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar.
2021-04-14AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 16. Noes 0.) (April 14).
2021-04-05AssemblyRe-referred to Com. on APPR. pursuant to Assembly Rule 96.
2021-03-26AssemblyRe-referred to Com. on JUD.
2021-03-25AssemblyRead second time and amended.
2021-03-24AssemblyFrom committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on JUD. (Ayes 15. Noes 0.) (March 23).
2021-02-12AssemblyReferred to Coms. on HEALTH and JUD.
2021-02-03AssemblyFrom printer. May be heard in committee March 5.
2021-02-02AssemblyRead first time. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Health and Safety Code11834.026Amended CodeCitation Text
Health and Safety Code11834.26Amended CodeCitation Text

California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback