CA AB381 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 12 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-07-12 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 87, Statutes of 2019.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

An act to amend Section 67386 of the Education Code, relating to postsecondary education.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Postsecondary education: sexual assault and sexual violence prevention training: intimate partner and dating violence.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-07-01 - Senate - Consent Calendar AB381 (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-05 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with the recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-11 - Assembly - AB 381 Reyes Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 72 N: 0 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-03 - Assembly - Do pass. To Consent Calendar (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-19 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-07-12 Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 87, Statutes of 2019.
2019-07-12 Approved by the Governor.
2019-07-08AssemblyEnrolled and presented to the Governor at 3:30 p.m.
2019-07-01AssemblyIn Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling.
2019-07-01SenateRead third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 1876.).
2019-06-25SenateRead second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar.
2019-06-24SenateFrom committee: Be ordered to second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8 and ordered to Consent Calendar.
2019-06-05SenateFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (June 5). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2019-04-24SenateReferred to Com. on ED.
2019-04-11SenateIn Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
2019-04-11AssemblyRead third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 72. Noes 0. Page 1189.)
2019-04-04AssemblyRead second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar.
2019-04-03AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (April 3).
2019-03-25AssemblyRe-referred to Com. on APPR.
2019-03-21AssemblyRead second time and amended.
2019-03-20AssemblyFrom committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 12. Noes 0.) (March 19).
2019-02-15AssemblyReferred to Com. on HIGHER ED.
2019-02-06AssemblyFrom printer. May be heard in committee March 8.
2019-02-05AssemblyRead first time. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Education Code67386Amended CodeCitation Text

California State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback