CA AB381 | 2009-2010 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on October 11 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-10-11 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 437, Statutes of 2009.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

An act to add Section 710.9 to the Unemployment Insurance Code, relating to unemployment insurance, and making an appropriation therefor.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Unemployment compensation disability benefits: academic

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2009-09-01 - Assembly - AB 381 BLOCK Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 78 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2009-08-27 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB381 Block By DeSaulnier (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2009-07-06 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2009-06-25 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2009-05-11 - Assembly - AB 381 BLOCK Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 78 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
2009-04-29 - Assembly - Do pass, to Consent Calendar (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2009-04-01 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]

History

DateChamberAction
2009-10-11 Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 437, Statutes of 2009.
2009-10-11 Approved by the Governor.
2009-09-08 Enrolled and to the Governor at 4:15 p.m.
2009-09-01 Senate amendments concurred in. To enrollment. (Ayes 78. Noes 0. Page 2847.)
2009-08-27 In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 30 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
2009-08-27 Read third time, passed, and to Assembly. (Ayes 37. Noes 0. Page 1964.)
2009-07-07 Read second time. To third reading.
2009-07-06 From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (July 6).
2009-06-26 From committee: Do pass, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. Re-referred. (Ayes 5. Noes 1.) (June 25).
2009-06-22 In committee: Hearing postponed by committee.
2009-06-01 From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on L. & I.R.
2009-05-21 Referred to Com. on L. & I.R.
2009-05-11 In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
2009-05-11 Read third time, passed, and to Senate. (Ayes 78. Noes 0. Page 1364.)
2009-05-04 Read second time. To Consent Calendar.
2009-04-30 From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (April 29).
2009-04-15 Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2009-04-14 Read second time and amended.
2009-04-13 From committee: Amend, do pass as amended, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (April 1).
2009-03-26 Referred to Com. on INS.
2009-02-24 From printer. May be heard in committee March 26.
2009-02-23 Read first time. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Insurance Code710.9New CodeSee Bill Text

California State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/cgi-bin/postquery?bill_number=ab_381&sess=0910&house=A
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/09-10/bill/asm/ab_0351-0400/ab_381_bill_20090223_introduced.html
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/09-10/bill/asm/ab_0351-0400/ab_381_bill_20090414_amended_asm_v98.html
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/09-10/bill/asm/ab_0351-0400/ab_381_bill_20090601_amended_sen_v97.html
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/09-10/bill/asm/ab_0351-0400/ab_381_bill_20090903_enrolled.html
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/09-10/bill/asm/ab_0351-0400/ab_381_bill_20091011_chaptered.html
Roll Callhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/09-10/bill/asm/ab_0351-0400/ab_381_vote_20090401_000001_asm_comm.html
Roll Callhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/09-10/bill/asm/ab_0351-0400/ab_381_vote_20090429_000001_asm_comm.html
Roll Callhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/09-10/bill/asm/ab_0351-0400/ab_381_vote_20090511_0230PM_asm_floor.html
Roll Callhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/09-10/bill/asm/ab_0351-0400/ab_381_vote_20090625_000003_sen_comm.html
Roll Callhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/09-10/bill/asm/ab_0351-0400/ab_381_vote_20090706_000001_sen_comm.html
Roll Callhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/09-10/bill/asm/ab_0351-0400/ab_381_vote_20090827_0944AM_sen_floor.html
Roll Callhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/09-10/bill/asm/ab_0351-0400/ab_381_vote_20090901_1020AM_asm_floor.html

Bill Comments 750

feedback