CA AB38 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 14 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-09-14 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 379, Statutes of 2018.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

An act to amend Sections 28102, 28104, 28106, 28110, 28114, 28116, 28120, 28122, 28128, 28130, 28134, 28136, 28142, 28144, and 28154 of, to add Sections 28111, 28117, 28153, and 28153.5 to, and to add Article 3 (commencing with Section 28125) to Chapter 2 of Division 12.5 of, the Financial Code, relating to student loan servicers.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Student loan servicers: licensing and regulation: Student Loan Servicing Act.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-08-27 - Assembly - AB 38 STONE Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 55 N: 23 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-08-23 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB38 Mark Stone By Galgiani (Y: 28 N: 11 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-20 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-15 - Assembly - AB 38 STONE Assembly Third Reading (Y: 55 N: 23 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-10 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 12 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-24 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 8 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-09-14 Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 379, Statutes of 2018.
2018-09-14 Approved by the Governor.
2018-09-04AssemblyEnrolled and presented to the Governor at 3 p.m.
2018-08-27AssemblySenate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 55. Noes 23. Page 6642.).
2018-08-23AssemblyIn Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 25 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
2018-08-23SenateRead third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 28. Noes 11. Page 5662.).
2018-08-21SenateRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2018-08-20SenateRead third time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
2018-08-07SenateRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2018-08-06SenateFrom committee: Be ordered to second reading pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8.
2018-06-26SenateRead second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2018-06-25SenateFrom committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 2.) (June 20).
2018-06-11SenateFrom committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on B. & F.I.
2018-05-30SenateIn committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
2018-03-15SenateRe-referred to Com. on B. & F.I.
2018-03-15SenateRe-referred to Com. on RLS.
2018-03-15SenateWithdrawn from committee.
2017-09-07SenateFrom committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on I., B. & F.I.
2017-07-12SenateIn committee: Set, first hearing. Testimony taken.
2017-07-03SenateFrom committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on I., B. & F.I.
2017-05-24SenateReferred to Com. on I., B. & F.I.
2017-05-15SenateIn Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
2017-05-15AssemblyRead third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 55. Noes 23. Page 1535.)
2017-05-11AssemblyRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2017-05-10AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass. (Ayes 12. Noes 5.) (May 10).
2017-04-25AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 8. Noes 3.) (April 24). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2017-04-04AssemblyIn committee: Hearing postponed by committee.
2017-03-29AssemblyIn committee: Hearing postponed by committee.
2017-03-27AssemblyRe-referred to Com. on B. & F.
2017-03-23AssemblyFrom committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on B. & F. Read second time and amended.
2017-03-23AssemblyReferred to Com. on B. & F.
2016-12-06AssemblyFrom printer. May be heard in committee January 5.
2016-12-05AssemblyRead first time. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Financial Code28102Amended CodeCitation Text
Financial Code28104Amended CodeCitation Text
Financial Code28106Amended CodeCitation Text
Financial Code28110Amended CodeCitation Text
Financial Code28111New CodeSee Bill Text
Financial Code28114Amended CodeCitation Text
Financial Code28116Amended CodeCitation Text
Financial Code28117New CodeSee Bill Text
Financial Code28120Amended CodeCitation Text
Financial Code28122Amended CodeCitation Text
Financial Code28128Amended CodeCitation Text
Financial Code28130Amended CodeCitation Text
Financial Code28134Amended CodeCitation Text
Financial Code28136Amended CodeCitation Text
Financial Code28142Amended CodeCitation Text
Financial Code28144Amended CodeCitation Text
Financial Code28153New CodeSee Bill Text
Financial Code28153.5New CodeSee Bill Text
Financial Code28154Amended CodeCitation Text
Financial Code28170Amended CodeCitation Text

California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback